This case was last updated from PACER on 07/21/2021 at 14:45:13 (UTC).

Allison Quient v. Azusa Pacific University

Case Summary

On 08/24/2020 Allison Quient filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Azusa Pacific University. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Fernando M. Olguin and Shashi H. Kewalramani. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-01714

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Fernando M. Olguin

Referral Judge

Shashi H. Kewalramani

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Allison Quient

Defendants

Azusa Pacific University

DOES 1 through 10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Morgan James Good

Attorney at Myers Law Group APC

9327 Fairway View Place Suite 100

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730

David P Myers

Attorney at Myers Law Group APC

9327 Fairway View Place Suite 100

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730

Robert M Kitson

Attorney at Myers Law Group APC

9327 Fairway View Place Suite 100

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730

Defendant Attorney

David M Lester

Attorney at Atkinson Andelson Loya Ruud and Romo APC

12800 Center Court Drive South Suite 300

Cerritos, CA 90703-9364

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Document submitted in the wrong case. Case closed pursuant to the Court's 9/16/2020 Order. All future filings shall be filed in ED CV 20-0319 FMO (SHKx) until further notice from the court. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (iv) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

#13

(#13) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 Answer to First Amended Complaint filed in Consolidate Case No. 5:20-cv-01714-DMG-SP filed by Defendant Azusa Pacific University.(Attorney David M Lester added to party Azusa Pacific University(pty:dft))(Lester, David) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

#12

(#12) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: CONSOLIDATION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Allison Quient v. Los Angeles Pacific University, ED CV 20-0319 FMO (SHKx) and Allison Quient v. Azusa Pacific University, ED CV 20-1714 FMO (SHKx) are hereby consolidated. The Clerk shall consolidate these actions such that the earlier filed action, ED CV 20-0319 FMO (SHKx), is the lead case. All future filings shall be filed in ED CV 20-0319 FMO (SHKx) until further notice from the court. The Clerk shall administratively close Case No. ED CV 20-1714 FMO (SHKx). (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (iv) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

#10

(#10) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: CONSOLIDATION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See Order for dates and deadlines.* (iv) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

#9

(#9) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 5:20-cv-00319 FMO(SHKx). Case transferred from Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym to Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:20-cv-01714 FMO(SHKx). Signed by Judge Fernando M. Olguin (rn) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

#8

(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Azusa Pacific University. (jtil) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

#7

(#7) Notice to counsel re consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge Eastern Division Blackout Case. (jtil) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (jtil) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Allison Quient, (Good, Morgan) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Allison Quient. (Good, Morgan) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

#2

(#2) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Allison Quient. (Good, Morgan) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27764452 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Allison Quient. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Morgan James Good added to party Allison Quient(pty:pla))(Good, Morgan) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Document submitted in the wrong case. Case closed pursuant to the Court's 9/16/2020 Order. All future filings shall be filed in ED CV 20-0319 FMO (SHKx) until further notice from the court. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (iv) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 Answer to First Amended Complaint filed in Consolidate Case No. 5:20-cv-01714-DMG-SP filed by Defendant Azusa Pacific University.(Attorney David M Lester added to party Azusa Pacific University(pty:dft))(Lester, David) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: CONSOLIDATION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Allison Quient v. Los Angeles Pacific University, ED CV 20-0319 FMO (SHKx) and Allison Quient v. Azusa Pacific University, ED CV 20-1714 FMO (SHKx) are hereby consolidated. The Clerk shall consolidate these actions such that the earlier filed action, ED CV 20-0319 FMO (SHKx), is the lead case. All future filings shall be filed in ED CV 20-0319 FMO (SHKx) until further notice from the court. The Clerk shall administratively close Case No. ED CV 20-1714 FMO (SHKx). (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (iv) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • Docket(#11) TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: CONSOLIDATION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See Order for dates and deadlines.* (iv) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 5:20-cv-00319 FMO(SHKx). Case transferred from Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym to Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:20-cv-01714 FMO(SHKx). Signed by Judge Fernando M. Olguin (rn) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Azusa Pacific University. (jtil) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice to counsel re consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge Eastern Division Blackout Case. (jtil) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (jtil) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Allison Quient, (Good, Morgan) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Allison Quient. (Good, Morgan) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Allison Quient. (Good, Morgan) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27764452 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Allison Quient. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Morgan James Good added to party Allison Quient(pty:pla))(Good, Morgan) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AZUSA PACIFIC UNIVERSITY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Morgan J Good

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert M Kitson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David P Myers