Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/15/2020 at 09:40:57 (UTC).

Quicken Loans Inc. v. Success Funding et al

Case Summary

On 04/16/2020 Quicken Loans Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Success Funding. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Victoria A. Roberts and David R. Grand. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-10944

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Victoria A. Roberts

Referral Judge

David R. Grand

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Quicken Loans Inc.

Defendants

Success Funding

Alex A. Dadourian

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thomas J. Murray

Attorney at King & Murray, PLLC

355 S. Old Woodward Ave., Suite 100

Birmingham, MI 48009

Defendant Attorney

Scott W. Kraemer

Attorney at Kuiper Orlebeke PC

180 Monroe Avenue, Nw, Suite 400

Grand Rapids, MI 49503

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Scott W. Kraemer on behalf of All Defendants. (Kraemer, Scott) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER Satisfying Show Cause. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

#5

(#5) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Quicken Loans Inc.. (Murray, Thomas) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER to Show Cause Show Cause Response due by 4/24/2020 Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer) (Entered: 04/18/2020)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Issued for *Success Funding* (LGra) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Issued for *Alex A. Dadourian* (LGra) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Chart of fraudulent loans

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Broker Agreement

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Quicken Loans Inc. against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7745373 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Los Angeles. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Broker Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Chart of fraudulent loans) (Murray, Thomas) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Scott W. Kraemer on behalf of All Defendants. (Kraemer, Scott) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER Satisfying Show Cause. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Quicken Loans Inc.. (Murray, Thomas) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER to Show Cause Show Cause Response due by 4/24/2020 Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer) (Entered: 04/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Issued for *Success Funding* (LGra) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Issued for *Alex A. Dadourian* (LGra) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketA United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Quicken Loans Inc. against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7745373 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Los Angeles. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Broker Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Chart of fraudulent loans) (Murray, Thomas) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Quicken Loans, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas J. Murray