This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/20/2021 at 09:13:05 (UTC).

Queens Grant Villas Horizontal Property Regime II et al v. Rockhill Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 09/21/2021 Queens Grant Villas Horizontal Property Regime II filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Rockhill Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judge overseeing this case is David C Norton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:21-CV-03044

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David C Norton

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Queens Grant Villas Horizontal Property Regime II

Queens Grant Regime, II, Inc.

Defendant

Rockhill Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Charles Whaley Thomson

Attorney at The Capell Law Firm LLC

321 E Bay Street

Charleston, SC 29401

Glynn L Capell

Attorney at The Capell Law Firm LLC

Po Box 1559

Bluffton, SC 29910

Defendant Attorneys

Nicholas Andrew Farr

Attorney at Rogers Townsend, LLC

401 N Main Streetste 100

Greenville, SC 29601

Phillip Earl Reeves

Attorney at Gallivan White and Boyd

Po Box 10589

Greenville, SC 29603

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

List of Exhibits

1 #2

Exhibit A - State Court Documents

1 #3

Exhibit B - Copy of Order Dated August 24, 2021

#3

4 #4

Main Document

4 #1

Supporting Documents Acknowledgment of State Court - II

#5

(#5) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Queens Grant Regime, II, Inc..(Thomson, Charles) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Queens Grant Regime, II, Inc..(Thomson, Charles) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Beaufort County. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Acknowledgment of State Court - II)(Reeves, Phillip) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Rockhill Insurance Company.(hcor, ) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Beaufort County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2021CP0700487. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-10084922), filed by Rockhill Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 List of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #3 Exhibit B - Copy of Order Dated August 24, 2021)(hcor, ) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROCKHILL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Phillip Earl Reeves

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nicholas Andrew Farr