This case was last updated from PACER on 10/26/2021 at 07:31:02 (UTC).

Queen's Court Owners Association v. Everest Denali Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 08/27/2021 Queen's Court Owners Association filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Everest Denali Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ricardo S. Martinez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01168

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ricardo S. Martinez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Queen's Court Owners Association

Defendants

Everest Denali Insurance Company

Everest Indemnity Insurance Company

Everest National Insurance Company

Everest Premier Insurance Company

Everest Security Insurance Company

Doe Insurance Companies 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jerry H. Stein

Attorney at STEIN SUDWEEKS & STEIN, PLLC

2701 First Ave Ste 430

Seattle, WA 98121

Daniel Stein

Attorney at STEIN SUDWEEKS & STEIN, PLLC

2701 First Ave Ste 430

Seattle, WA 98121

Dylan Hannafious

Attorney at STEIN SUDWEEKS & STEIN, PLLC

2701 First Ave Ste 430

Seattle, WA 98121

Jessica Burns

Attorney at STEIN SUDWEEKS & STEIN, PLLC

2701 First Ave Ste 430

Seattle, WA 98121

Justin D Sudweeks

Attorney at STEIN SUDWEEKS & STEIN, PLLC

2701 First Ave Ste 430

Seattle, WA 98121

Defendant Attorneys

Alexander A Jurisch

Attorney at BULLIVANT HOUSER BAILEY (SEA)

925 Fourth Ave Ste 3800

Seattle, WA 98104-1157

Daniel Rahn Bentson

Attorney at BULLIVANT HOUSER BAILEY (SEA)

925 Fourth Ave Ste 3800

Seattle, WA 98104-1157

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons

1 #3

Summons

1 #4

Summons

1 #5

Summons

1 #6

Summons

2 #2

Main Document

2 #1

Summons

2 #2

Summons

2 #3

Summons

2 #4

Summons

#3

#4

#5

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Daniel Rahn Bentson on behalf of Defendants Everest Denali Insurance Company, Everest Indemnity Insurance Company, Everest National Insurance Company, Everest Premier Insurance Company, Everest Security Insurance Company. (Bentson, Daniel) (Entered: 10/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Joint Status Report due by 10/27/2021, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 10/13/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/20/2021. (LC) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Queen's Court Owners Association (Stein, Daniel) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketNOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 9/7/2021. (CDA) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Everest Denali Insurance Company, Everest Indemnity Insurance Company, Everest National Insurance Company, Everest Premier Insurance Company, Everest Security Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(CDA) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketJudge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (CDA) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7227688), filed by Queen's Court Owners Association. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Stein, Daniel) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Everest Security Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Everest Premier Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where EVEREST INDEMNITY INSURANCE is a litigant

Latest cases where EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant