This case was last updated from PACER on 10/19/2021 at 09:15:13 (UTC).

Quattro v. Petsmart, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/20/2021 Quattro filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Petsmart, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Arenda L. Wright Allen and Lawrence R. Leonard. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00478

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Arenda L. Wright Allen

Referral Judge

Lawrence R. Leonard

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mary Quattro

Defendants

Petsmart, Inc.

Mars, Inc.

Petsmart LLC doing business as PetSmart

Medical Management International, Inc doing business as Banfield, The Pet Hospital

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

George Albiston

Attorney at Albiston Brannon & Gilbert

580 E. Main Street, Suite 330

Norfolk, VA 23510

Defendant Attorneys

Randall Clair Lenhart, Jr.

Attorney at Kalbaugh Pfund & Messersmith PC (Norfolk)

1200 Pnc Bank Bldg., 555 East Main St

Norfolk, VA 23510

Brian Allen Cafritz

Attorney at Kalbaugh Pfund & Messersmith PC

901 Moorefield Park Dr, Suite 200

Richmond, VA 23236

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER to Complaint (Amended) by Petsmart LLC.(Lenhart, Randall) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Summons Issued as to Medical Management International, Inc, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (Attachments: #1 Procedure for Civil Motions)(dbra, ) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Mary Quattro.(Albiston, George) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 10/4/21. (dbra, ) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Proposed Summons re #5 Amended Complaint by Mary Quattro. (Albiston, George) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Motion for Leave to file Amended Complaint Mary Quattro against All Defendants, filed by Mary Quattro. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint)(Albiston, George) Modified on 9/16/2021 (dbra, ). (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER re #5 Amended Complaint filed by Mary Quattro: For the reasons stated in this ORDER, Plaintiffs Amended Complaint filing (ECF No. 5) is VACATED without prejudice. Plaintiff may file a Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint that contains accurate information. Plaintiff is also advised to attach to any such Motion a proposed Amended Complaint, and that this document should adequately describe facts supporting Plaintiffs legal claims. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 9/3/21. (dbra, ) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Mars, Inc., Petsmart, Inc., filed by Mary Quattro. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order to Amend Complaint)(Albiston, George) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Petsmart, Inc.. (Lenhart, Randall) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Magistrate Judge Notice and Judge's Information to counsel. (epri, ) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Correction re #1 Notice of Removal. Document number 1-4, Corporate Disclosure, should not be filed as an attachment to your initiating document. Please file the document again as a Corporate or Financial Disclosure Statement using its respective filing event. (epri, ) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketInitial Case Assignment to District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen and Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard. (epri, ) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Petsmart, Inc. (epri, ) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-7955117.), filed by Petsmart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Complaint, #2 Exhibit B Objection to Venue and Answer, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Rule 7.1 Disclosure)(Lenhart, Randall) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MEDICAL MANAGEMENT INTERNATIONAL, INC. d/b/a BANFIELD PET HOSPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases where MARS, INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases where PACIFIC COAST DISTRIBUTING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Randall Clair Lenhart, Jr.