This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/30/2022 at 08:48:42 (UTC).

Quates v. Secretary, United States Department of State et al

Case Summary

On 03/01/2022 Quates filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against Secretary, United States Department of State. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Carlos E. Mendoza and Embry J. Kidd. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-00437

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Carlos E. Mendoza

Referral Judge

Embry J. Kidd

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chanthou Quates

Defendants

Secretary, United States Department of State

Ambassador, Cambodia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Stoller

Attorney at Law Offices of David Stoller, PA

4445 S Conway Rd

Orlando, FL 32812-0073

 

Court Documents

#3

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 3/1/2022. (MEH) ctp (Entered: 03/01/2022)

#6

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS returned executed as to Attorney General on 3/11/22, as to U.S. Attorney on 3/7/22 by Chanthou Quates (Attachments: #1 Exhibit proof of service)(Stoller, David) Modified on 3/24/2022 (SPM). (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PROOF of service by Chanthou Quates. Ambassador, Cambodia served on 3/11/2022 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Summons Executed)(Stoller, David) Modified on 3/24/2022 (SPM). (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PROOF of Service by Chanthou Quates. Secretary, United States Department of State served on 3/11/2022 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Summons Executed)(Stoller, David) Modified on 3/24/2022 (SPM). (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Order by Chanthou Quates. (Stoller, David) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Chanthou Quates. Related case(s): Yes (Stoller, David) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 3/1/2022. (MEH) ctp (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 3/1/2022. (MEH) ctp (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Ambassador, Cambodia and Secretary, United States Department of State. (BD) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:22-cv-0437-CEM-EJK. (SJB) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-19288750) filed by Chanthou Quates. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Exhibit Approval I-130, #5 Exhibit Correspondence, #6 Exhibit Online Portal)(Stoller, David) Modified on 3/1/2022 to correct docket text (BD). (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SECRETARY UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Stoller