This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/24/2023 at 08:22:43 (UTC).

Qualserve Solutions LLC v. Samsung Electronics America, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/23/2023 Qualserve Solutions LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Samsung Electronics America, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Edgardo Ramos. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-00550

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Edgardo Ramos

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Qualserve Solutions LLC

Defendant

Samsung Electronics America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Andrew S. Curfman

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A-US8046489

1 #2

Exhibit B-Claim Chart

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

#3

(#3) AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

#4

(#4) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Qualserve Solutions LLC..(Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

#5

(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Qualserve Solutions LLC..(Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

6 #6

Main Document

6 #1

Exhibit Declaration

6 #2

Exhibit A-Certificate of Good Standing

6 #3

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

#7

(#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (sj) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

#8

(#8) AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(sj) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

#9

(#9) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Samsung Electronics America, Inc. served on 2/2/2023, answer due 2/23/2023. Service was accepted by Mohamed Dansoko. Document filed by Qualserve Solutions LLC..(Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

#10

(#10) FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Andrew S. Curfman dated 02/03/2023. Document filed by Qualserve Solutions LLC..(Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

#11

(#11) ORDER: granting #10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #10 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint. addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Andrew S. Curfman dated 02/03/2023. Defendants request for an extension of 60 days, until April 24, 2023, to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is granted. SO ORDERED. Samsung Electronics America, Inc. answer due 4/24/2023. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 2/03/2023) (ama) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER: granting #10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #10 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint. addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Andrew S. Curfman dated 02/03/2023. Defendants request for an extension of 60 days, until April 24, 2023, to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is granted. SO ORDERED. Samsung Electronics America, Inc. answer due 4/24/2023. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 2/03/2023) (ama) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Andrew S. Curfman dated 02/03/2023. Document filed by Qualserve Solutions LLC..(Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Samsung Electronics America, Inc. served on 2/2/2023, answer due 2/23/2023. Service was accepted by Mohamed Dansoko. Document filed by Qualserve Solutions LLC..(Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(sj) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (sj) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (sj) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #6 MOTION for Andrew S. Curfman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27236336. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Andrew S. Curfman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27236336. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Qualserve Solutions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration, #2 Exhibit A-Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Qualserve Solutions LLC..(Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Qualserve Solutions LLC..(Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27236189)Document filed by Qualserve Solutions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-US8046489, #2 Exhibit B-Claim Chart).(Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less