This case was last updated from PACER on 09/05/2020 at 11:02:41 (UTC).

Qualls v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Case Summary

On 07/07/2020 Qualls filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Social Security Administration Commissioner. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark E. Ford and Erin L. Wiedemann. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-03045

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Mark E. Ford

Erin L. Wiedemann

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jonathan C. Qualls

Defendant

Social Security Administration Commissioner

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Frederick S. Spencer

Attorney at Attorney at Law

Spencer Law Building, 409 East Sixth Street

Mountain Home, AR 72653-3999

Defendant Attorney

Office of Regional Counsel-Dallas

Attorney at OGCSSAR4

 

Court Documents

#10

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#1

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketTEXT ONLY MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT. Case reassigned to Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann. Honorable Mark E. Ford no longer assigned to the case. (hnc) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, Office of Regional Counsel, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (tg) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested for USA Agency, Corporation, Officers or Employees as to Commissioner of SSA for service of the following document: #2 Complaint,. (Spencer, Frederick) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketComplaint fee received: $ 400, receipt number 5007244. (tg) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) TEXT ONLY ORDER denying #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The purpose of 28 U.S.C. 1915 is to ensure that indigent litigants have an entre, not a barrier, to the federal courts. In re Williamson, 786 F.2d 1336, 1338 (8th Cir. 1986) (quoting Souder v. McGuire, 516 F.2d 820, 823 (3rd Cir. 1975)). Although a claimant need not be completely destitute to take advantage of the IFP statute, he or she must show that paying the filing fee would result in an undue financial hardship. Williamson, 786 F.2d at 1338. After review of the application it has been determined that Plaintiff has adequate income and assets in the bank to cover the filing fee.. Accordingly, Plaintiffs motion for leave to proceed IFP is DENIED. Plaintiff is directed to tender the filing fee of 400.00. Should Plaintiff fail to comply within the required period of time, his/her complaint will become subject to summary dismissal for failure to obey a court order.( Filing Fee due by 8/14/2020); Motions terminated: #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jonathan C. Qualls, #7 Amended MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jonathan C. Qualls.. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on July 15, 2020. (cla) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Amended MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jonathan C. Qualls. (Spencer, Frederick) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • Docket(#6) TEXT ONLY ORDER that the matter has been provisionally filed as the undersigned finds that additional information is needed to rule on Plaintiff's IFP application. Specifically the Court requires the following information: Plaintiff has indicated that he is married, but has failed to provide any information concerning his spouse's sources of income. Failure to comply within the time period specified could result in summary dismissal for failure to obey a court order. Amended IFP due by 8/3/2020. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on July 13, 2020. (cla) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CONSENT TO ASSIGNMENT to U.S. Magistrate Judge by Jonathan C. Qualls. Government consent acknowledged pursuant to Standing Consent Letter. (Spencer, Frederick) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF DIRECT ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings and for entry of a final judgment. You must file the attached form memorializing consent or requesting reassignment to a District Judge within fourteen (14) days. Consent or Reassignment form due by 7/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Reassignment Form)(tg) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jonathan C. Qualls. (Spencer, Frederick) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner, filed by Jonathan C. Qualls. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - redacted Notice of Decision - Unfavorable, #3 Exhibit B - redacted Notice of Appeals Council Action)(Spencer, Frederick) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Jonathan C. Qualls. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (tg) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less