This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:20:29 (UTC).

Quakertown Community School District Bucks County, Pennsyvania v. JUUL LABS, INC.

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Quakertown Community School District Bucks County, Pennsyvania filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against JUUL LABS, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is William H. Orrick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-07998

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William H. Orrick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Quakertown Community School District Bucks County, Penneylvania

Defendant

Juul Labs, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stephen A Corr

Attorney at Begley Carlin & Mandio, LLP

680 Middletown Boulevard

Langhorne, PA 19047

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against JUUL LABS, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE206137.), filed by QUAKERTOWN COMMUNITY SCHOOL DISTRICT BUCKS COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA.(bw, ) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

#4

(#4) Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-05135. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by QUAKERTOWN COMMUNITY SCHOOL DISTRICT BUCKS COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA re: Adam Golden served Summons and Complaint upon JUUL LABS, INC. by Personally serving Agent. JUUL LABS, INC. served on 11/18/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. (CORR, STEPHEN) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#2

(#2) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO THE U.S.D.C. FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA. 12/4/19 ENTERED. (kw, ) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

4 #1

*Restricted*

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: Summons Issued #1 Complaint Do Not Enter Parties in all Capital Letters (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2019) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • MEMBER CASE OPENED: Pennsylvania Eastern, 2:19-cv-05135-RBS, Quakertown Community School District Bucks Country, Pennsyvania v. Juul Labs, Inc., Opened in California Northern District as 3:19-cv-7998-WHO pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 11 cc: JPMDL (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2019) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-05135. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by QUAKERTOWN COMMUNITY SCHOOL DISTRICT BUCKS COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA re: Adam Golden served Summons and Complaint upon JUUL LABS, INC. by Personally serving Agent. JUUL LABS, INC. served on 11/18/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. (CORR, STEPHEN) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO THE U.S.D.C. FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA. 12/4/19 ENTERED. (kw, ) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • 1 Summons Issued as to JUUL LABS, INC.. Forwarded To: COUNSEL on 11/1/2019 (bw, ) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DEMAND for Trial by Jury by QUAKERTOWN COMMUNITY SCHOOL DISTRICT BUCKS COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA. (bw, ) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against JUUL LABS, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE206137.), filed by QUAKERTOWN COMMUNITY SCHOOL DISTRICT BUCKS COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA.(bw, ) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.