This case was last updated from PACER on 09/24/2021 at 08:26:19 (UTC).

Quaker v. Federal Emergency Management Agency

Case Summary

On 07/26/2021 Quaker filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Federal Emergency Management Agency. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Vernon S. Broderick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-06309

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Vernon S. Broderick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dawn Quaker

New York, NY 10038

Defendant

Federal Emergency Management Agency

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Jessica F. Rosenbaum

U.S. Attorney'S Office, Sdny (Chambers Street), 86 Chambers Street

New York, NY 10007

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Motion, Memorandum of Law in Support, Declaration of Kevin D. Yusman, and Notice to Pro Se Litigant served on Dawn Quaker on September 15, 2021. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Federal Emergency Management Agency..(Rosenbaum, Jessica) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Notice to Pro Se Litigant Regarding Rule 12 Motion. Document filed by Federal Emergency Management Agency..(Rosenbaum, Jessica) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

#9

(#9) DECLARATION of Kevin D. Yusman in Support re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Federal Emergency Management Agency..(Rosenbaum, Jessica) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

#8

(#8) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Federal Emergency Management Agency..(Rosenbaum, Jessica) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

#7

(#7) MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Federal Emergency Management Agency..(Rosenbaum, Jessica) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #4 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 7/29/2021) (kv) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

#4

(#4) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Jessica F. Rosenbaum dated July 28, 2021. Document filed by Federal Emergency Management Agency..(Rosenbaum, Jessica) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal, SDNY Electronic Case Filing Rules & Instructions, and Individual Practice Rules of the Hon. Vernon S. Broderick and the Hon. Ona T. Wang served on Dawn Quaker on July 27, 2021. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Federal Emergency Management Agency..(Rosenbaum, Jessica) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rosenbaum, Jessica) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

1 #1

Exhibit Summons with Notice

1 #1

Main Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Motion, Memorandum of Law in Support, Declaration of Kevin D. Yusman, and Notice to Pro Se Litigant served on Dawn Quaker on September 15, 2021. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Federal Emergency Management Agency..(Rosenbaum, Jessica) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Notice to Pro Se Litigant Regarding Rule 12 Motion. Document filed by Federal Emergency Management Agency..(Rosenbaum, Jessica) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DECLARATION of Kevin D. Yusman in Support re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Federal Emergency Management Agency..(Rosenbaum, Jessica) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Federal Emergency Management Agency..(Rosenbaum, Jessica) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Federal Emergency Management Agency..(Rosenbaum, Jessica) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Federal Emergency Management Agency answer due 9/16/2021. (kv) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #4 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 7/29/2021) (kv) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Jessica F. Rosenbaum dated July 28, 2021. Document filed by Federal Emergency Management Agency..(Rosenbaum, Jessica) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal, SDNY Electronic Case Filing Rules & Instructions, and Individual Practice Rules of the Hon. Vernon S. Broderick and the Hon. Ona T. Wang served on Dawn Quaker on July 27, 2021. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Federal Emergency Management Agency..(Rosenbaum, Jessica) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (vf) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rosenbaum, Jessica) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 100686/2021..Document filed by Federal Emergency Management Agency. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons with Notice).(Rosenbaum, Jessica) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Federal Emergency Management Agency is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jessica F. Rosenbaum