This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 08:44:46 (UTC).

Quaintance v. Herb Hallman Chevrolet

Case Summary

On 02/06/2020 Quaintance filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Herb Hallman Chevrolet. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Miranda M. Du and William G. Cobb. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00084

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Miranda M. Du

Referral Judge

William G. Cobb

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gary Quaintance

Defendants

Herb Hallman Chevrolet, Inc.

Herb Hallman Chevrolet, Inc. doing business as Champion Chevrolet

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Raelene K. Palmer

Attorney at The Palmer Law Firm, P.C.

5550 Painted Mirage Road, Suite 320

Las Vegas, NV 89149

Trevor J. Hatfield

Attorney at Hatfield & Associates, Ltd.

703 S. 8Th Street

Las Vegas, NV 89101

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ORDER granting ECF No. #8 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Trevor J. Hatfield as attorney of record for Plaintiff. Attorney Raelene K. Palmer terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 3/18/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Trevor J. Hatfield on behalf of Plaintiff Gary Quaintance. (Hatfield, Trevor) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

8 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Substitution of Attorney

#8

(#8) MOTION to Substitute Attorney Trevor J. Hatfield, Esq. in for Attorney Plaintiff Pro Se by Plaintiff Gary Quaintance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Substitution of Attorney) (Hatfield, Trevor) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

7 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 2 - State Bar Formal Opinion

7 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Declaration

#7

(#7) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Plaintiff Gary Quaintance. Responses due by 3/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Declaration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - State Bar Formal Opinion) (Palmer, Raelene) (Entered: 02/29/2020)

#4

(#4) ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (AB) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Herb Hallman Chevrolet, Inc.. (AB) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Gary A. Quaintance. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Palmer, Raelene) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Herb Hallman Chevrolet d/b/a Champion Chevrolet (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5878369) by Gary A. Quaintance. Proof of service due by 5/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Palmer, Raelene) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 02/06/2020)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting ECF No. #8 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Trevor J. Hatfield as attorney of record for Plaintiff. Attorney Raelene K. Palmer terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 3/18/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Trevor J. Hatfield on behalf of Plaintiff Gary Quaintance. (Hatfield, Trevor) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Substitute Attorney Trevor J. Hatfield, Esq. in for Attorney Plaintiff Pro Se by Plaintiff Gary Quaintance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Substitution of Attorney) (Hatfield, Trevor) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Plaintiff Gary Quaintance. Responses due by 3/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Declaration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - State Bar Formal Opinion) (Palmer, Raelene) (Entered: 02/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE: Attorney Action Required to #1 Complaint, #2 Certificate of Interested Parties. Attorney Raelene Palmer advised to review LR IA 10-2 and comply with the rule in all future filings in this case. (no image attached) (WJ) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • Docket(#5) STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Chief Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (AB) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Herb Hallman Chevrolet, Inc.. (AB) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin for ENE. (WJ) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (WJ) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Gary A. Quaintance. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Palmer, Raelene) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Herb Hallman Chevrolet d/b/a Champion Chevrolet (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5878369) by Gary A. Quaintance. Proof of service due by 5/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Palmer, Raelene) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Herb Hallman Chevrolet, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Trevor J. Hatfield