This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/22/2022 at 07:37:32 (UTC).

Qiuzi Hu et al v. Jose M. Plehn-Dujowich et al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2022 Qiuzi Hu filed an Other lawsuit against Jose M Plehn-Dujowich. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Philip S. Gutierrez and Karen E. Scott. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:22-CV-01751

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Philip S. Gutierrez

Referral Judge

Karen E. Scott

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Qiuzi Hu

Edwin Ramirez

Ivan Ronceria

Wenzhi Fei

Defendants

Jose M. Plehn-Dujowich

Jose M. Plehn

Bizqualify LLC

Powerlytics, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael Ryan Fleming

Harmeet Dhillon

Krista L Baughman

Loren Kieve

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Judgment

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: MISC - Registration of Judgment from Another District (AO-451) #1 . The following error(s) was found: A certified copy of the judgment from the district in which judgment was entered is missing. Counsel must file a certified copy of the judgment from that district to meet the requirements set forth in 28 U.S.C. 1963. (lh) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

3 #3

Main Document

3 #1

Certified copy of the Judgment

4 #4

Main Document

4 #1

Declaration

4 #2

Proposed Order

#5

(#5) NOTICE of New Case Number and Judge Assignment by Clerk. This case is hereby converted from case type MC to case type CV because subsequent filings have changed the nature of the case. A new case number has therefore been assigned to this case. District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott are assigned to this new case number. All future documents must be filed under the new case number, which is 8:22-cv-01751-PSG-KESx. The previous case number, 8:22-mc-00009-UA, is hereby terminated. (car) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

#6

(#6) ORDER TO APPEAR FOR EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR RE: ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott: Granting #4 APPLICATION for Judgment Debtor Exam as to Jose M. Plehn-Dujowich. Judgment Debtor Exam set for 10/27/2022 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (es) (Entered: 09/26/2022)

#7

(#7) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Wenzhi Fei, Qiuzi Hu, Edwin Ramirez, Ivan Ronceria, re Order on Motion for Judgment Debtor Exam, #6 served on 10/04/2022. (Fleming, Michael) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

#8

(#8) MINUTES OF Judgment Debtor Examination held before Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott: Case is called. Counsel for Judgment Creditor states his appearance. Judgment Debtor is not present. Court gives counsel instructions re further proceedings. Court Reporter: CS 10/27/22. (es) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MINUTES OF Judgment Debtor Examination held before Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott: Case is called. Counsel for Judgment Creditor states his appearance. Judgment Debtor is not present. Court gives counsel instructions re further proceedings. Court Reporter: CS 10/27/22. (es) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Wenzhi Fei, Qiuzi Hu, Edwin Ramirez, Ivan Ronceria, re Order on Motion for Judgment Debtor Exam, #6 served on 10/04/2022. (Fleming, Michael) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER TO APPEAR FOR EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR RE: ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott: Granting #4 APPLICATION for Judgment Debtor Exam as to Jose M. Plehn-Dujowich. Judgment Debtor Exam set for 10/27/2022 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (es) (Entered: 09/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of New Case Number and Judge Assignment by Clerk. This case is hereby converted from case type MC to case type CV because subsequent filings have changed the nature of the case. A new case number has therefore been assigned to this case. District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott are assigned to this new case number. All future documents must be filed under the new case number, which is 8:22-cv-01751-PSG-KESx. The previous case number, 8:22-mc-00009-UA, is hereby terminated. (car) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPLICATION for Judgment Debtor Exam as to All Plaintiffs filed by Plaintiff Qiuzi Hu, Wenzhi Fei, Ivan Ronceria, Edwin Ramirez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Fleming, Michael) (Entered: 09/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REGISTRATION OF JUDGMENT FROM ANOTHER DISTRICT with filing fee previously paid (49 paid on 06/21/2022, receipt number 33502076), filed by Plaintiff's attorney Qiuzi Hu, Wenzhi Fei, Ivan Ronceria, Edwin Ramirez. (Attachments: #1 Certified copy of the Judgment)(Fleming, Michael) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: MISC - Registration of Judgment from Another District (AO-451) #1 . The following error(s) was found: A certified copy of the judgment from the district in which judgment was entered is missing. Counsel must file a certified copy of the judgment from that district to meet the requirements set forth in 28 U.S.C. 1963. (lh) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) REGISTRATION OF JUDGMENT FROM ANOTHER DISTRICT Receipt No: ACACDC-33502076 - Fee: $49, filed by Plaintiff's attorney Qiuzi Hu. (Attachments: #1 Judgment) (Attorney Michael Ryan Fleming added to party Qiuzi Hu(pty:pla))(Fleming, Michael) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less