This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/06/2021 at 07:29:25 (UTC).

Qi v. JD Produce Maspeth LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/07/2021 Qi filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against JD Produce Maspeth LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Cheryl L. Pollak and Ann M Donnelly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-03211

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Cheryl L. Pollak

Presiding Judge

Ann M Donnelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jian Qi

Defendants

Sheng Bo Dong

Yi Feng Ye

Jessica Dong

JD Trucking Maspeth Inc

Shengbo Dong

Yifeng Ye

JD Produce Maspeth LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Aaron Schweitzer

Attorney at Troy Law, PLLC

41-25 Kissena Boulevard, Ste 103

Flushing, NY 11355

John Troy

Attorney at Troy Law, PLLC

41-25 Kissena Blvd., Suite 103

Flushing, NY 11355

Defendant Attorneys

Jian Hang

Attorney at Hang & Associates, PLLC

136-20 38Th Avenue, Suite 10G

Flushing, NY 11354

Shan Zhu

Attorney at Hang & Associates, PLLC

136-20 38Th Avenue, Suite 10G

Flushing, NY 11354

 

Court Documents

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

2 #1

Proposed Summons

#2

1 #4

Exhibit 04 Notice of Lien and Assignment

1 #2

Exhibit 02 Notice to Inspect Share Records

1 #1

Exhibit 01 Notice to Enforce Shareholder Liability for Services Rendered

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jian Qi. Jessica Dong served on 7/16/2021, answer due 8/6/2021. (Troy, John) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jian Qi. Yi Feng Ye served on 7/16/2021, answer due 8/6/2021. (Troy, John) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jian Qi. Sheng Bo Dong served on 7/16/2021, answer due 8/6/2021. (Troy, John) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jian Qi. JD Trucking Maspeth Inc served on 7/16/2021, answer due 8/6/2021. (Troy, John) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jian Qi. JD Produce Maspeth LLC served on 7/16/2021, answer due 8/6/2021. (Troy, John) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Jian Hang on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Hang, Jian) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Shan Zhu on behalf of Jessica Dong, Sheng Bo Dong, JD Produce Maspeth LLC, JD Trucking Maspeth Inc, Yi Feng Ye (aty to be noticed) (Zhu, Shan) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Related Case: The Civil Cover Sheet filed in this civil action indicates a related case. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Ann M Donnelly and Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Schweitzer on behalf of Jian Qi (aty to be noticed) (Schweitzer, Aaron) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by John Troy on behalf of Jian Qi (notification declined or already on case) (Troy, John) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CONSENT to become party in a collective action. by Jian Qi (Troy, John) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons.Civil Cover Sheet.. by Jian Qi (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons) (Troy, John) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Jessica Dong, Sheng Bo Dong, JD Produce Maspeth LLC, JD Trucking Maspeth Inc, Yi Feng Ye filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14542583 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Jian Qi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 01 Notice to Enforce Shareholder Liability for Services Rendered, #2 Exhibit 02 Notice to Inspect Share Records, #3 Exhibit 03 Document Preservation Demand, #4 Exhibit 04 Notice of Lien and Assignment, #5 Exhibit 05 Notice that Retaliation is Illegal under the FLSA and NYLL, #6 Exhibit 06 Notice Settlement Under the Table is Prohibited) (Troy, John) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JD PRODUCE MASPETH LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Aaron B. Schweitzer

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Troy