This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/02/2021 at 11:35:55 (UTC).

Qdoba Restaurant Corporation v. Zurich American Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 12/04/2020 Qdoba Restaurant Corporation filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Zurich American Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is S. Kato Crews. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03575

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

S. Kato Crews

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Qdoba Restaurant Corporation DBA Qdoba Mexican Eats

Qdoba Restaurant Corporation

Defendant

Zurich American Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daniel Erik Rhynhart

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP-Philadelphia

One Logan Square, 130 North 18Th Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103-6998

Defendant Attorneys

Christopher S. Clemenson

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor-Denver

707 17Th Street, Suite 3100

Denver, CO 80202-3400

Alicia Grace Curran

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor-Dallas

1717 Main Street, Suite 3100

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Defendant Zurich American Insurance Company. (Clemenson, Christopher) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

#12

(#12) MOTION for Leave to Appear for Alicia G. Curran by Defendant Zurich American Insurance Company. (Curran, Alicia) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

#10

(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Zurich American Insurance Company. (Clemenson, Christopher) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

8 #1

Magistrate Judge Consent Form

#8

(#8) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jgonz, ) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

7 #1

Summons Copy

#7

(#7) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Zurich American Insurance Company re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Qdoba Restaurant Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Summons Copy)(Rhynhart, Daniel) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

#6

(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Quidditch Acquisition, Inc. for Qdoba Restaurant Corporation. (Rhynhart, Daniel) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Lisa M. Campisi by Daniel Erik Rhynhart on behalf of Qdoba Restaurant Corporation (Rhynhart, Daniel) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Linda Kornfeld by Daniel Erik Rhynhart on behalf of Qdoba Restaurant Corporation (Rhynhart, Daniel) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

#3

(#3) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. NO SUMMONS ISSUED. (alave, ) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Zurich American Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7618150)Attorney Daniel Erik Rhynhart added to party Qdoba Restaurant Corporation DBA Qdoba Mexican Eats(pty:pla), filed by Qdoba Restaurant Corporation DBA Qdoba Mexican Eats. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rhynhart, Daniel) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Defendant Zurich American Insurance Company. (Clemenson, Christopher) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear. The Court GRANTS Defendant's Motion. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 1-26-2021. Text Only Entry (skclc2). (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for Leave to Appear for Alicia G. Curran by Defendant Zurich American Insurance Company. (Curran, Alicia) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Given the unopposed nature of the Motion, the Court finds good cause to GRANT the Motion. Accordingly, Defendant Zurich American Insurance Company answer is due 2-2-2021. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 1-15-2021. Text Only Entry (skclc2). (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Zurich American Insurance Company. (Clemenson, Christopher) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2020
  • Docket(#9) Setting Telephonic Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. The Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 3-16-2021 at 9:30 am in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order, and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 3-9-2021. The Magistrate Judge Consent Form [#8-1] is due 3-9-2021. Dial in information for the Scheduling Conference is as follows:CONFERENCE CALL LINE: (888) 251-2909ACCESS CODE: 5662814# SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 12-19-2020. Text Only Entry (skclc2). (Entered: 12/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jgonz, ) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Zurich American Insurance Company re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Qdoba Restaurant Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Summons Copy)(Rhynhart, Daniel) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Quidditch Acquisition, Inc. for Qdoba Restaurant Corporation. (Rhynhart, Daniel) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Lisa M. Campisi by Daniel Erik Rhynhart on behalf of Qdoba Restaurant Corporation (Rhynhart, Daniel) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Linda Kornfeld by Daniel Erik Rhynhart on behalf of Qdoba Restaurant Corporation (Rhynhart, Daniel) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. NO SUMMONS ISSUED. (alave, ) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (alave, ) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Zurich American Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7618150)Attorney Daniel Erik Rhynhart added to party Qdoba Restaurant Corporation DBA Qdoba Mexican Eats(pty:pla), filed by Qdoba Restaurant Corporation DBA Qdoba Mexican Eats. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rhynhart, Daniel) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where QDOBA RESTAURANT CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Zurich American Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel E Rhynhart