This case was last updated from PACER on 04/20/2021 at 10:17:49 (UTC).

QATAR NATIONAL BANK v. GOVERNMENT OF ERITREA et al

Case Summary

On 02/19/2021 QATAR NATIONAL BANK filed an Other lawsuit against GOVERNMENT OF ERITREA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas F. Hogan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00436

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas F. Hogan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

QATAR NATIONAL BANK

Defendants

STATE OF ERITREA

GOVERNMENT OF ERITREA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert Kelsey Kry

Attorney at MOLOLAMKEN, LLP

600 New Hampshire Avenue, Nw, Suite 660

Washington, DC 20037

 

Court Documents

8 #2

Exhibit B

8 #1

Exhibit A

#8

(#8) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to STATE OF ERITREA served on 3/29/2021, answer due 5/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Kry, Robert) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

7 #2

Exhibit B

7 #1

Exhibit A

#7

(#7) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to GOVERNMENT OF ERITREA served on 3/29/2021, answer due 5/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Kry, Robert) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

6 #1

Waybill

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF CLERK of mailing one copy of the summons and complaint, together with a translation of each into the official language of the foreign state on 3/16/2021, by DHL, to the agency or instrumentality of the foreign state, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3). (eg) (Main Document 6 replaced on 3/18/2021) (znmw). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/18/2021: #1 Waybill) (zeg). (Entered: 03/16/2021)

5 #1

Notice and Consent

#5

(#5) SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to GOVERNMENT OF ERITREA, STATE OF ERITREA. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

#4

(#4) AFFIDAVIT REQUESTING FOREIGN MAILING by QATAR NATIONAL BANK. (Kry, Robert) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

3 #1

Exhibit

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF SUIT PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1608(a) AND 22 C.F.R. 93.2 by QATAR NATIONAL BANK (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Kry, Robert) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

#2

(#2) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by QATAR NATIONAL BANK (Kry, Robert) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against GOVERNMENT OF ERITREA, STATE OF ERITREA ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8218963) filed by QATAR NATIONAL BANK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Kry, Robert) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to STATE OF ERITREA served on 3/29/2021, answer due 5/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Kry, Robert) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to GOVERNMENT OF ERITREA served on 3/29/2021, answer due 5/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Kry, Robert) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF CLERK of mailing one copy of the summons and complaint, together with a translation of each into the official language of the foreign state on 3/16/2021, by DHL, to the agency or instrumentality of the foreign state, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3). (eg) (Main Document 6 replaced on 3/18/2021) (znmw). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/18/2021: #1 Waybill) (zeg). (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to GOVERNMENT OF ERITREA, STATE OF ERITREA. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Thomas F. Hogan. (zsb) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AFFIDAVIT REQUESTING FOREIGN MAILING by QATAR NATIONAL BANK. (Kry, Robert) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF SUIT PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1608(a) AND 22 C.F.R. 93.2 by QATAR NATIONAL BANK (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Kry, Robert) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by QATAR NATIONAL BANK (Kry, Robert) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against GOVERNMENT OF ERITREA, STATE OF ERITREA ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8218963) filed by QATAR NATIONAL BANK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Kry, Robert) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Kelsey Kry