This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/20/2020 at 09:32:19 (UTC).

Q3 Networking LLC v. Hewlett Packard Enterprise Co. et al

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 Q3 Networking LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Hewlett Packard Enterprise Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard G. Andrews. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01265

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Andrews

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Q3 Networking LLC

Defendants

Aruba Networks, Inc.

Hewlett Packard Enterprise Co.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Rolando A. Diaz

Attorney at Dunlap Bennett & Ludwig PLLC

1000 N. West Street, Suite 1203

Wilmington, DE 19801

Tracy L. Pearson

Attorney at Dunlap Bennett & Ludwig PLLC

1000 N. West Street, Suite 1203

Wilmington, DE 19801

Jerry D. Tice, II

Justin B. Kimble

Patrick J. Conroy

T. William Kennedy, Jr.

Jonathan H. Rastegar

Defendant Attorney

John V. Gorman

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP

1201 N. Market Street, Ste 2201

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#12

#11

10 #3

Exhibit 2

10 #2

Exhibit 1

10 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#10

#9

8 #5

Certification

8 #4

Certification

8 #3

Certification

8 #2

Certification

8 #1

Certification

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER Administratively Closing Case (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/10/2020. (nms) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER Granting #10 Unopposed Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/10/2020. (nms) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Unopposed Motion to Stay - filed by Aruba Networks, Inc., Hewlett Packard Enterprise Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Gorman, John) Modified on 11/10/2020 (nms). (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to Complaint to November 13, 2020 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Aruba Networks, Inc. answer due 11/13/2020; Hewlett Packard Enterprise Co. answer due 11/13/2020). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/13/2020. (nms) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to Complaint to November 13, 2020 - filed by Aruba Networks, Inc., Hewlett Packard Enterprise Co.. (Gorman, John) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Justin B. Kimble, T. William Kennedy, Jr, Jonathan H. Rastegar, Jerry D. Tice, II for Q3 Networking LLC for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01263-RGA, 1:20-cv-01264-RGA, 1:20-cv-01265-RGA(kmd) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Patrick J. Conroy for Q3 Networking LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01263-RGA, 1:20-cv-01264-RGA, 1:20-cv-01265-RGA(kmd) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Patrick J. Conroy, Justin B. Kimble, T. William Kennedy, Jonathan H. Rastegar and Jerry D. Tice III, filed by Q3 Networking LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/2/2020. (nms) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Patrick J. Conroy, Justin B. Kimble, T. William Kennedy, Jonathan H. Rastegar and Jerry D. Tice III - filed by Q3 Networking LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Certification, #3 Certification, #4 Certification, #5 Certification)(Pearson, Tracy) Modified on 10/2/2020 (nms). (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Q3 Networking LLC. Hewlett Packard Enterprise Co. served on 9/22/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (Pearson, Tracy) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Q3 Networking LLC. Aruba Networks, Inc. served on 9/22/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (Pearson, Tracy) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01263-RGA, 1:20-cv-01264-RGA, 1:20-cv-01265-RGA (rjb) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Q3 Networking LLC. (Pearson, Tracy) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (myr) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 7,457,627 B2 ;US 7,609,677 B2 ;US 7,895,305 B2 ;US 8,797,853 B2. (myr) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Aruba Networks, Inc., Hewlett Packard Enterprise Co. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-3212482.) - filed by Q3 Networking LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Q3 NETWORKING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ARUBA NETWORKS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where HP INC., fka Hewlett-Packard Company is a litigant