This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/20/2021 at 12:20:17 (UTC).

Q3 NETWORKING LLC v. COMMSCOPE HOLDING COMPANY, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 02/19/2021 Q3 NETWORKING LLC filed an Other lawsuit against COMMSCOPE HOLDING COMPANY, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Carl J. Nichols. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-MC-00015

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Carl J. Nichols

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Q3 NETWORKING LLC

Respondents

RUCKUS WIRELESS, INC.

COMMSCOPE, INC.

NETGEAR, INC.

HEWLETT PACKARD ENTERPRISE CO.

ARUBA NETWORKS, INC.

COMMSCOPE HOLDING COMPANY, INC.

ARRIS US HOLDINGS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Louis S. Mastriani

Attorney at ADDUCI, MASTRIANI & SCHAUMBERG, L.L.P.

1133 Connecticut Ave, Nw, Twelfth Floor

Washington, DC 20036

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibits

1 #2

Text of Proposed Order

#2

#3

#4

4 #1

Letter Rogatory

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Letters Rogatory Issued granting #1 Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on March 4, 2021. (Attachments: #1 Letter Rogatory) (lccjn2) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketFiling fee received: $ 49, receipt number: 4616105131. (eg) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by Q3 NETWORKING LLC (eg) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by Q3 NETWORKING LLC. Case related to Case No. 21-mc-006. (eg) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory by Q3 NETWORKING LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(eg) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Q3 NETWORKING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where COMMSCOPE HOLDING COMPANY INC is a litigant