This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/19/2022 at 08:26:44 (UTC).

Pyfrom v. Great West Casualty Company et al

Case Summary

On 04/20/2022 Pyfrom filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Great West Casualty Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are J. Randal Hall and Brian K. Epps. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00047

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. Randal Hall

Referral Judge

Brian K. Epps

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Vickie Taylor Pyfrom

Defendants

Great West Casualty Company

Heniff Transportation Systems, LLC

Homer S. Keirsey

James Bernard Nolen

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Eddie Gene Stone, Jr

Attorney at Law Office of Eddie G. Stone LLC

1629 Monroe Dr. N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30324

John W. Adkins

Attorney at Adkins Law Firm, LLC

1629 Monroe Drive, Ne

Atlanta, GA 30324

Kenneth L. Shigley

Attorney at Shigley Law Firm

950 East Paces Ferry Road N.E., Suite 1625

Atlanta, GA 30326

Defendant Attorney

Dennis B. Keene

Attorney at Bouhan Falligant, LLP

One West Park Avenue, P.O. Box 2139

Savannah, GA 31402-2139

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Return of Service served on James Nolen on 6-2-22, filed by Vickie Taylor Pyfrom. (Adkins, John) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

#15

(#15) Litigants' Bill of Rights by Vickie Taylor Pyfrom. (Adkins, John) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

#14

(#14) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Vickie Taylor Pyfrom. (Adkins, John) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

#13

(#13) Litigants' Bill of Rights by Homer S. Keirsey. (Keene, Dennis) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

#12

(#12) Litigants' Bill of Rights by Heniff Transportation Systems, LLC. (Keene, Dennis) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

#11

(#11) Litigants' Bill of Rights by Great West Casualty Company. (Keene, Dennis) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

#10

(#10) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Heniff Transportation Systems, LLC. (Keene, Dennis) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

#9

(#9) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Great West Casualty Company. (Keene, Dennis) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

#8

(#8) Defendants Heniff Transportation Systems, LLC and Homer S. Keirsey's ANSWER to Complaint by Heniff Transportation Systems, LLC, Homer S. Keirsey.(Keene, Dennis) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

#7

(#7) Defendant Great West Casualty Company's ANSWER to Complaint by Great West Casualty Company.(Keene, Dennis) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

#6

(#6) Affidavit of Service as to Heniff Transportation Systems, LLC, on April 26, 2022 (Adkins, John) Modified on 5/3/2022 (thb). (Entered: 05/02/2022)

#5

(#5) Affidavit of Service as to Great West Casualty Company, on April 26, 2022 (Adkins, John) Modified on 5/3/2022 (thb). (Entered: 05/02/2022)

#4

(#4) Affidavit of Service as to Homer S. Keirsey, on April 28, 2022 (Adkins, John) Modified on 5/3/2022 (thb). (Entered: 05/02/2022)

3 #1

Civil Case Forms

3 #3

Main Document

2 #3

Summons - Homer S. Keirsey

2 #2

Summons - James Bernard Nolen

2 #1

Summons - Heniff Transportation Systems, LLC

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: James Bernard Nolen answer due 6/23/2022. (thb) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Return of Service served on James Nolen on 6-2-22, filed by Vickie Taylor Pyfrom. (Adkins, John) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Litigants' Bill of Rights by Vickie Taylor Pyfrom. (Adkins, John) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Vickie Taylor Pyfrom. (Adkins, John) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Litigants' Bill of Rights by Homer S. Keirsey. (Keene, Dennis) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Litigants' Bill of Rights by Heniff Transportation Systems, LLC. (Keene, Dennis) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Litigants' Bill of Rights by Great West Casualty Company. (Keene, Dennis) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Heniff Transportation Systems, LLC. (Keene, Dennis) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Great West Casualty Company. (Keene, Dennis) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Defendants Heniff Transportation Systems, LLC and Homer S. Keirsey's ANSWER to Complaint by Heniff Transportation Systems, LLC, Homer S. Keirsey.(Keene, Dennis) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Defendant Great West Casualty Company's ANSWER to Complaint by Great West Casualty Company.(Keene, Dennis) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Great West Casualty Company answer due 5/19/2022; Heniff Transportation Systems, LLC answer due 5/17/2022; Homer S. Keirsey answer due 5/17/2022. (thb) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Affidavit of Service as to Heniff Transportation Systems, LLC, on April 26, 2022 (Adkins, John) Modified on 5/3/2022 (thb). (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Affidavit of Service as to Great West Casualty Company, on April 26, 2022 (Adkins, John) Modified on 5/3/2022 (thb). (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Affidavit of Service as to Homer S. Keirsey, on April 28, 2022 (Adkins, John) Modified on 5/3/2022 (thb). (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 04/20/2022. (Attachments: #1 Civil Case Forms.) (jlh) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Great West Casualty Company, Heniff Transportation Systems, LLC, Homer S. Keirsey, and James Bernard Nolen. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Heniff Transportation Systems, LLC, #2 Summons - James Bernard Nolen, and #3 Summons - Homer S. Keirsey.) (jlh) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against all Defendants, filed by Vickie Taylor Pyfrom. (Fee paid: Receipt # AGASDC-3330638, $402.00.) (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet.) (jlh) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Heniff Transportation Systems, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where GREAT WEST CASUALTY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dennis B. Keene(Designation Retained)