This case was last updated from PACER on 10/15/2021 at 05:53:26 (UTC).

Pusztai et al v. Apple Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/12/2021 Pusztai filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Apple Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles R. Breyer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-07995

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles R. Breyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Laszlo Pusztai

DIRE Studio Szolgaltato Korlatolt Felelossegu Tarsasag a Hungarian Limited Liability Company doing business as DIRE Studio KFT

Defendants

Apple Inc.

Apple Canada, Inc.

Apple Distribution International Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joshua Gordon Graubart

Attorney at Law Offices of Joshua Graubart, P.C.

1177 Ave. Of The Americas, 5Th Fl.

New York, NY 10036

Defendant Attorney

Cydney Swofford Freeman

Attorney at Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

865 S Figueroa St Ste 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) ORDER granting #18 Motion to Transfer Case. Pending before the Court is a Joint Application pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) to Transfer this Action to the Northern District of California. The Court hereby GRANTS the Joint Application. IT IS ORDERED, therefore, that the above-captioned action is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. SO ORDERED. Consistent with this order, the Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the case. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 10/1/2021) (va) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. Modified on 10/8/2021 (va). (Entered: 10/01/2021)

#23

(#23) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/7/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/14/2022 08:30 AM in San Francisco, - To be determined. (ecgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2021) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

#22

(#22) Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:21-cv-04813. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 10/14/2021)

#17

***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #17 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (km) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

#16

No Description Available

#15

No Description Available

#13

No Description Available

#12

No Description Available

#11

No Description Available

#9

No Description Available

8 #1

Exhibit 1 to First Amended Complaint - Copyright Registration Certificates

#8

(#20) JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #8 Amended Complaint, addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Cydney Swofford Freeman dated 10/01/2021. Document filed by Apple Inc...(Freeman, Cydney) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

#7

No Description Available

#6

No Description Available

#4

(#4) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by DIRE Studios Kft...(Graubart, Joshua) (Entered: 05/29/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Graubart, Joshua) (Entered: 05/29/2021)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/7/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/14/2022 08:30 AM in San Francisco, - To be determined. (ecgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2021) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:21-cv-04813. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketCASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Northern District of California. (va) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTransmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re: #21 Order on Motion to Transfer Case to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. (va) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER granting #18 Motion to Transfer Case. Pending before the Court is a Joint Application pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) to Transfer this Action to the Northern District of California. The Court hereby GRANTS the Joint Application. IT IS ORDERED, therefore, that the above-captioned action is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. SO ORDERED. Consistent with this order, the Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the case. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 10/1/2021) (va) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. Modified on 10/8/2021 (va). (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #8 Amended Complaint, addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Cydney Swofford Freeman dated 10/01/2021. Document filed by Apple Inc...(Freeman, Cydney) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #19 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (km) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by DIRE Studio Szolgaltato Korlatolt Felelossegu Tarsasag, Laszlo Pusztai. Related Document Number: #18 ..(Graubart, Joshua) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) JOINT MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California. Document filed by DIRE Studio Szolgaltato Korlatolt Felelossegu Tarsasag, Laszlo Pusztai..(Graubart, Joshua) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #17 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (km) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT COPYRIGHT FORM. Notice to Attorney Joshua Gordon Graubart re: Document No. #3 AO 121 Form Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s):. the Docket Number and Date Filed field on the AO 121 Copyright form was not completed by the attorney. Do not re-file the form. The Court has corrected the deficiency/deficiencies. (vf) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (vf) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Joshua Gordon Graubart. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of U.S. (vf) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Joshua Gordon Graubart. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: DIRE Studio Kft; Apple Inc., Laszlo Pusztai. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted; alias party name was omitted; party name entered incorrectly. (vf) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by DIRE Studios Kft...(Graubart, Joshua) (Entered: 05/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Graubart, Joshua) (Entered: 05/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Graubart, Joshua) (Entered: 05/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Apple Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24607607)Document filed by Laszlo Pusztai, DIRE Studio Szolgaltato Korlatolt Felelossegu Tarsasag. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Complaint).(Graubart, Joshua) (Entered: 05/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Apple Distribution International is a litigant

Latest cases where Apple Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cydney Swofford Freeman