This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/02/2022 at 08:16:39 (UTC).

Purple Innovation, LLC v. Photon Interactive UK Limited

Case Summary

On 05/03/2022 Purple Innovation, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Photon Interactive UK Limited. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Colm F. Connolly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00601

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colm F. Connolly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Purple Innovation, LLC

Defendant

Photon Interactive UK Limited

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeremy Douglas Anderson

Attorney at Fish & Richardson, P.C.

222 Delaware Avenue, 17Th Floor, P.O. Box 1114

Wilmington, DE 19899-1114

Jordan K. Cameron

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

#3

(#3) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Purple Innovation, Inc. for Purple Innovation, LLC filed by Purple Innovation, LLC. (apk) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Purple Innovation, LLC: For Photon Interactive UK Limited waiver sent on 5/12/2022, answer due 8/10/2022. (Anderson, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jordan K. Cameron - filed by Purple Innovation, LLC. (Anderson, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Jordan K. Cameron for Purple Innovation, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (twk) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jordan K. Cameron, filed by Purple Innovation, LLC. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 5/25/2022. (kmd) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jordan K. Cameron - filed by Purple Innovation, LLC. (Anderson, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Purple Innovation, LLC: For Photon Interactive UK Limited waiver sent on 5/12/2022, answer due 8/10/2022. (Anderson, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (nms) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketNo Summons Issued. (apk) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Purple Innovation, Inc. for Purple Innovation, LLC filed by Purple Innovation, LLC. (apk) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed against Photon Interactive UK Limited ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3865915.) - filed by Purple Innovation, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(apk) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jordan K. Cameron

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeremy Douglas Anderson