This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/16/2022 at 07:23:21 (UTC).

PURNELL v. GOODLEAP, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/18/2022 PURNELL filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against GOODLEAP, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is R. BARCLAY SURRICK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-02773

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

R. BARCLAY SURRICK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GWENDOLYN PURNELL

Defendants

GOODLEAP, LLC

SUNRUN INC

VIVINT SOLAR, INC.

VIVINT SOLAR DEVELOPER, LLC

LEROI TAYLOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ANDREW M. MILZ

Attorney at FLITTER MILZ, P.C.

450 N Narberth Ave Suite 101

Narberth, PA 19072

JODY T LOPEZ-JACOBS

450 Narberth Ave, Suite 101

Narberth, PA 19072

PETER D. SCHNEIDER

Attorney at COMMUNITY LEGAL SERVICES, INC.

1424 Chestnut St.

Philadelphia, PA 19102

ROBERT WILSON BALLENGER

Attorney at COMMUNITY LEGAL SERVICES

1424 Chestnut St

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Defendant Attorneys

SAMANTHA L. SOUTHALL

Attorney at BUCHANAN INGERSOLL & ROONEY PC

50 S. 16Th St Ste 3200, Two Liberty Place

Philadelphia, PA 19102

ALEXANDER NEMIROFF

Attorney at GORDON & REES, LLP

Three Logan Square, 1717 Arch St

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief, #10 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief filed by GWENDOLYN PURNELL. (MILZ, ANDREW) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT WILSON BALLENGER on behalf of GWENDOLYN PURNELL (BALLENGER, ROBERT) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

13 #4

Exhibit

13 #3

Exhibit

13 #2

Exhibit

13 #1

Exhibit

13 #13

Main Document

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by PETER D. SCHNEIDER on behalf of GWENDOLYN PURNELL with Certificate of Service(SCHNEIDER, PETER) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

11 #1

Exhibit 1

10 #3

Text of Proposed Order

10 #2

Declaration of Matt Dawson

10 #1

Exhibit A

10 #10

Main Document

9 #1

Declaration of Zachary Cottman

9 #9

Main Document

7 #2

Exhibit

7 #1

Text of Proposed Order

7 #7

Main Document

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief, #10 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief filed by GWENDOLYN PURNELL. (MILZ, ANDREW) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • Docket(#15) Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (ke) (Entered: 08/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT WILSON BALLENGER on behalf of GWENDOLYN PURNELL (BALLENGER, ROBERT) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by GOODLEAP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(SOUTHALL, SAMANTHA) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by PETER D. SCHNEIDER on behalf of GWENDOLYN PURNELL with Certificate of Service(SCHNEIDER, PETER) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) PRAECIPE to Attach Exhibits by GOODLEAP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(SOUTHALL, SAMANTHA) Modified on 8/17/2022 (md). (Entered: 08/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief filed by GOODLEAP, LLC.Reply Brief. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Declaration of Matt Dawson, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(SOUTHALL, SAMANTHA) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief filed by SUNRUN INC, LEROI TAYLOR, VIVINT SOLAR DEVELOPER, LLC, VIVINT SOLAR, INC..Reply Brief. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Zachary Cottman)(NEMIROFF, ALEXANDER) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Litigation, #5 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by GWENDOLYN PURNELL. (MILZ, ANDREW) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by GWENDOLYN PURNELL.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit)(MILZ, ANDREW) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Litigation filed by GOODLEAP, LLC.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(SOUTHALL, SAMANTHA) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by SUNRUN INC, LEROI TAYLOR, VIVINT SOLAR DEVELOPER, LLC, VIVINT SOLAR, INC..Memorandum, Declaration. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration, #4 Exhibit B to Declaration)(NEMIROFF, ALEXANDER) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Sunrun Inc. with Certificate of Service by SUNRUN INC, VIVINT SOLAR DEVELOPER, LLC, VIVINT SOLAR, INC..(NEMIROFF, ALEXANDER) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by ALEXANDER NEMIROFF on behalf of SUNRUN INC, LEROI TAYLOR, VIVINT SOLAR DEVELOPER, LLC, VIVINT SOLAR, INC. (NEMIROFF, ALEXANDER) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by GOODLEAP, LLC, SUNRUN INC, LEROI TAYLOR, VIVINT SOLAR DEVELOPER, LLC, VIVINT SOLAR, INC..(SOUTHALL, SAMANTHA) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LEROI TAYLOR, VIVINT SOLAR, INC., SUNRUN INC, GOODLEAP, LLC, VIVINT SOLAR DEVELOPER, LLC (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16048844), filed by LEROI TAYLOR, VIVINT SOLAR, INC., SUNRUN INC, GOODLEAP, LLC, VIVINT SOLAR DEVELOPER, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Designation Form)(SOUTHALL, SAMANTHA) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GOODLEAP, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Vivint Solar Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where SUNRUN INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Vivint Solar Developer LLC is a litigant