This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/07/2023 at 08:12:42 (UTC).

Pulte Home Company LLC v. ACE American Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 12/09/2022 Pulte Home Company LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against ACE American Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Sunshine Suzanne Sykes and Sheri Pym. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:22-CV-02186

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sunshine Suzanne Sykes

Referral Judge

Sheri Pym

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pulte Home Company LLC

Defendants

ACE American Insurance Company

Capitol Insurance Company

First Mercury Insurance Company

International Insurance Company of Hannover SE

Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company

Kinsale Insurance Company

Liberty Mutual Insurance Company

Navigators Specialty Insurance Company

Peleus Insurance Company

Starr Indemnity Insurance Company

United Specialty Insurance Company

Does 1 through 50, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nathan Allen Cazier

Attorney at Payne and Fears LLP

4 Park Plaza Suite 1100

Irvine, CA 92614

Scott S Thomas

Attorney at Payne and Fears

4 Park Plaza Suite 1100

Irvine, CA 92614

Blake Alexander Dillion

Attorney at Payne and Fears LLP

4 Park Plaza Suite 1100

Irvine, CA 92614

Defendant Attorneys

Robert W Keaster

Attorney at Chamberlin and Keaster LLP

1581 Ventura Boulevard Suite 165

Encino, CA 91436-5208

Matthew Clark Lovell

Attorney at Nicolaides Fink Thorpe Michaelides Sullivan LLP

101 Montgomery Street Suite 2300

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to First Mercury Insurance Company answer now due 2/23/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant First Mercury Insurance Company.(Attorney Robert W Keaster added to party First Mercury Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Keaster, Robert) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

#22

(#22) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company answer now due 3/10/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company.(Attorney Matthew Clark Lovell added to party Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Lovell, Matthew) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

#21

(#21) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant United Specialty Insurance Company. (shb) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

#20

(#20) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Starr Indemnity Insurance Company. (shb) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

#19

(#19) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Peleus Insurance Company. (shb) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

#18

(#18) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Navigators Specialty Insurance Company. (shb) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

#17

(#17) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (shb) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

#16

(#16) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Kinsale Insurance Company. (shb) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

3 #10

Summons - United Specialty Insurance Company

3 #9

Summons - Starr Indemnity Insurance Company

3 #7

Summons - Navigators Specialty Insurance Company

3 #6

Summons - Liberty Mutual Insurance Company

3 #5

Summons - Kinsale Insurance Company

3 #4

Summons - Ironshore Specialty Insurance

3 #2

Summons - First Mercury Insurance Company

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Pulte Home Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Capitol Insurance Company, #2 Summons - First Mercury Insurance Company, #3 Summons - International Insurance Company, #4 Summons - Ironshore Specialty Insurance, #5 Summons - Kinsale Insurance Company, #6 Summons - Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, #7 Summons - Navigators Specialty Insurance Company, #8 Summons - Peleus Insurance Company, #9 Summons - Starr Indemnity Insurance Company, #10 Summons - United Specialty Insurance Company)(Thomas, Scott) (Entered: 12/09/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Pulte Home Company LLC. (Thomas, Scott) (Entered: 12/09/2022)

#1

(#14) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant International Insurance Company of Hannover SE. (shb) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to First Mercury Insurance Company answer now due 2/23/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant First Mercury Insurance Company.(Attorney Robert W Keaster added to party First Mercury Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Keaster, Robert) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company answer now due 3/10/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company.(Attorney Matthew Clark Lovell added to party Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Lovell, Matthew) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant United Specialty Insurance Company. (shb) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Starr Indemnity Insurance Company. (shb) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Peleus Insurance Company. (shb) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Navigators Specialty Insurance Company. (shb) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (shb) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Kinsale Insurance Company. (shb) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company. (shb) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant International Insurance Company of Hannover SE. (shb) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. (iva) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Pulte Home Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Capitol Insurance Company, #2 Summons - First Mercury Insurance Company, #3 Summons - International Insurance Company, #4 Summons - Ironshore Specialty Insurance, #5 Summons - Kinsale Insurance Company, #6 Summons - Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, #7 Summons - Navigators Specialty Insurance Company, #8 Summons - Peleus Insurance Company, #9 Summons - Starr Indemnity Insurance Company, #10 Summons - United Specialty Insurance Company)(Thomas, Scott) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (car) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (car) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Pulte Home Company LLC, identifying PulteGroup, Inc. (parent company of Plaintiff Pulte Home Company, LLC). (Thomas, Scott) (Entered: 12/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Pulte Home Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Capitol Insurance Company, #2 Summons - First Mercury Insurance Company, #3 Summons - International Insurance Company, #4 Summons - Ironshore Specialty Insurance, #5 Summons - Kinsale Insurance Company, #6 Summons - Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, #7 Summons - Navigators Specialty Insurance Company, #8 Summons - Peleus Insurance Company, #9 Summons - Starr Indemnity Insurance Company, #10 Summons - United Specialty Insurance Company)(Thomas, Scott) (Entered: 12/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Pulte Home Company LLC. (Thomas, Scott) (Entered: 12/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34454283 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Pulte Home Company LLC. (Attorney Scott S Thomas added to party Pulte Home Company LLC(pty:pla))(Thomas, Scott) (Entered: 12/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less