This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/17/2023 at 08:17:12 (UTC).

Pulte Home Company LLC et al v. United Specialty Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 11/18/2022 Pulte Home Company LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against United Specialty Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Eileen S Willett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-01972

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eileen S Willett

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Pulte Home Company LLC

Pulte Development Corporation

Defendants

United Specialty Insurance Company

Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company

Cincinnati Insurance Company

Cincinnati Casualty Company

Cincinnati Indemnity Company

Knight Specialty Insurance Company

Ironshore Indemnity Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Scott S Thomas

Attorney at Payne & Fears LLP - Phoenix, AZ

2375 E Camelback Rd., 6Th Fl.

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Defendant Attorney

Brent Randall Phillips

Attorney at Phillips Law Corporation - Orange, CA

7939 E Santa Cruz Ave.

Orange, CA 92869

 

Court Documents

13 #1

Consent Form

13 #13

Main Document

#12

(#12) NOTICE re: Corporate Disclosure by Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company . (Phillips, Brent) (Entered: 01/15/2023)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company.(Phillips, Brent) (Entered: 01/15/2023)

10 #6

Summons

10 #5

Summons

10 #4

Summons

10 #3

Summons

10 #2

Summons

10 #1

Summons

10 #10

Main Document

#9

(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pulte Development Corporation, Pulte Home Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent PulteGroup, Inc. for Pulte Development Corporation, Pulte Home Company LLC. (Thomas, Scott) (Entered: 12/09/2022)

8 #4

Summons Cincinnati Indemnity Company

8 #2

Summons The Cincinnati Insurance Company

8 #8

Main Document

1 #2

Attachment Certificate of Interested Parties

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Magistrate Election Form Deadline. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MAP) (Entered: 01/16/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE re: Corporate Disclosure by Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company . (Phillips, Brent) (Entered: 01/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company.(Phillips, Brent) (Entered: 01/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Summons Issued as to Cincinnati Casualty Company, Cincinnati Indemnity Company, Cincinnati Insurance Company, Ironshore Indemnity Incorporated, Knight Specialty Insurance Company, Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 12/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pulte Development Corporation, Pulte Home Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent PulteGroup, Inc. for Pulte Development Corporation, Pulte Home Company LLC. (Thomas, Scott) (Entered: 12/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Submitted by Pulte Development Corporation, Pulte Home Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Midwest Family Mutual Insurance, #2 Summons The Cincinnati Insurance Company, #3 Summons The Cincinnati Casualty Company, #4 Summons Cincinnati Indemnity Company, #5 Summons Knight Specialty Insurance Company, #6 Summons Ironshore Indemnity Incorporated)(Thomas, Scott) (Entered: 12/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiffs Pulte Development Corporation, Pulte Home Company LLC. (Thomas, Scott) (Entered: 12/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #2 Summons Submitted filed by Pulte Development Corporation, Pulte Home Company LLC. Unable to issue Summonses. Summonses are missing the attorney's information. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MYE) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Pulte Development Corporation, Pulte Home Company LLC. (MYE) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: [1-1] Civil Cover Sheet filed by Pulte Development Corporation, Pulte Home Company LLC. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MYE) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-21328098. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Eileen S Willett. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-1972-PHX-ESW. Magistrate Election form attached. (MYE) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Submitted by Pulte Development Corporation, Pulte Home Company LLC. (Thomas, Scott) (MYE) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number AAZDC-21328098 filed by Pulte Development Corporation, Pulte Home Company LLC. (Thomas, Scott) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Certificate of Interested Parties)(MYE) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midwest Family Mutual Insurance company is a litigant

Latest cases where The Cincinnati Casualty Company is a litigant

Latest cases where KNIGHT SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant