This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/18/2020 at 08:57:47 (UTC).

Pulliam v. CR Bard Inc et al

Case Summary

On 08/19/2020 Pulliam filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against CR Bard Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00176

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jolanda Pulliam

Defendants

Does 1 through 100 inclusive

McKesson Corporation

C R Bard Inc

Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Steven S. Schulte

Attorney at FEARS NACHAWATI PLLC

5473 Blair Road

Dallas, TX 75231

Darren McDowell

Attorney at Fears Nachawati, PLLC

5473 Blair Rd.

Dallas, TX 75231

Eric M. Przybysz

Attorney at SIMON GREENSTONE PC

1201 Elm St., Suite 3400

Dallas, TX 75270

Darren Patrick McDowell

Attorney at FEARS NACHAWATI PLLC

5473 Blair Road

Dallas, TX 75231

Defendant Attorneys

Jessica Junek

Attorney at HARTLINE BARGER LLP - Dallas

8750 N. Central Expy., Suite 1600

Dallas, TX 75231

Melissa Dorman Matthews

Attorney at HARTLINE BARGER LLP - Dallas

8750 N. Central Expy., Suite 1600

Dallas, TX 75231

Jordan E Jarreau

Attorney at HARTLINE BARGER LLP - Dallas

8750 N. Central Expy., Suite 1600

Dallas, TX 75231

Nicole Y Silver

Attorney at GREENBERG TRAURIG LLP - DC

2101 L Street Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20037

Kara T. Stubbs

Attorney at BAKER STERCHI LLC - Kansas City

2400 Pershing Rd., Suite 500

Kansas City, MO 64108-2533

 

Court Documents

#34

#32

#31

#30

#29

#28

#27

#26

1 #16

Exhibit(s) D-10 - Executed Return of Service Bard Peripheral

1 #15

Exhibit(s) D-9 - Executed Return of Service C.R. Bard

1 #14

Exhibit(s) D-8 - Executed Aff of Service to McKesson

1 #13

Exhibit(s) D-7 - Citation Issued McKisson

1 #12

Exhibit(s) D-6 - Citation Issued C.R. Bard Inc.

1 #11

Exhibit(s) D-5 - Citation Issued Bard Peripheral Vascular

1 #10

Exhibit(s) D-4 Jury Demand

1 #9

Exhibit(s) D-3 - Civil Case Info. Sheet

1 #8

Exhibit(s) D-2 - Plaintiffs' Original Petition

#1

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) Docket Text ORDER: Re: #34 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation. (Stubbs, Kara) filed by McKesson Corporation, C R Bard Inc, Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.. Motion GRANTED case stayed until February 23, 2021 all pending motions denied without prejudice. ( Response to Court due by 2/23/2021.) Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 09/01/20. (CMH) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation. (Stubbs, Kara) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) Docket Text ORDER: Re: #29 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Jordan E. Jarreau by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation. (Stubbs, Kara) filed by McKesson Corporation, C R Bard Inc, Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., #31 Amended MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney in Replacement of Dkt. 29 Motion to Withdraw ;attorney/firm Jordan E. Jarreau by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation. (Stubbs, Kara) filed by McKesson Corporation, C R Bard Inc, Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., #30 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Melissa Dorman Matthews by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation. (Stubbs, Kara) filed by McKesson Corporation, C R Bard Inc, Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., #28 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Jessica Junek by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation. (Stubbs, Kara) filed by McKesson Corporation, C R Bard Inc, Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. ; MOTIONS ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 8/28/20. (CSG) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) STIPULATION for Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendant McKesson Corporation by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation. (Stubbs, Kara) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Amended MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney in Replacement of Dkt. 29 Motion to Withdraw ;attorney/firm Jordan E. Jarreau by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation. (Stubbs, Kara) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Melissa Dorman Matthews by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation. (Stubbs, Kara) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Jordan E. Jarreau by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation. (Stubbs, Kara) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Jessica Junek by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation. (Stubbs, Kara) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ENTRY of Appearance by Kara T. Stubbs for Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation. (Stubbs, Kara) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ENTRY of Appearance by Nicole Y Silver for Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation. (Silver, Nicole) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corporation. (Junek, Jessica) (Main Document 10 replaced to flatten image on 6/16/2020) (dsr). (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by McKesson Corporation re #8 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Junek, Jessica) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by McKesson Corporation Attorney Jessica Junek added to party McKesson Corporation(pty:dft) (Junek, Jessica) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER: This case is hereby TRANSFERRED to the docket of the Honorable Karen Gren Scholer. All future pleadings shall subsequently be filed under Civil Action No. 3:20-cv-01490-S. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 6/10/2020) (aaa) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc. (Junek, Jessica) (Main Document 6 replaced with flattened document on 6/11/2020) (awc). (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by C R Bard Inc. (Junek, Jessica) (Main Document 5 replaced with flattened document on 6/11/2020) (awc). (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc re #3 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of State Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Junek, Jessica) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of State Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc (Junek, Jessica) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by C. R. Bard, Inc., Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10899538) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s) A - Portion of REACH Agreement (redacted), #4 Exhibit(s) B - McKesson, #5 Exhibit(s) C - 8-30-16 Romney, Kim Deposition, #6 Exhibit(s) D - Index of State Court Docs, #7 Exhibit(s) D-1 State Court Docket Sheet, #8 Exhibit(s) D-2 - Plaintiffs' Original Petition, #9 Exhibit(s) D-3 - Civil Case Info. Sheet, #10 Exhibit(s) D-4 Jury Demand, #11 Exhibit(s) D-5 - Citation Issued Bard Peripheral Vascular, #12 Exhibit(s) D-6 - Citation Issued C.R. Bard Inc., #13 Exhibit(s) D-7 - Citation Issued McKisson, #14 Exhibit(s) D-8 - Executed Aff of Service to McKesson, #15 Exhibit(s) D-9 - Executed Return of Service C.R. Bard, #16 Exhibit(s) D-10 - Executed Return of Service Bard Peripheral) (Junek, Jessica) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where McKesson Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where C.R. Bard, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven S. Schulte