This case was last updated from PACER on 04/30/2021 at 09:25:57 (UTC).

Pulfer et al v. C R Bard Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 Pulfer filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against C R Bard Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey J. Helmick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00463

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeffrey J. Helmick

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Rodney I Pulfer

Patricia A Pulfer

Defendants

C R Bard Incorporated

Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew R. McCarley

Attorney at Fears Nachawati

5473 Blair Road

Dallas, TX 75231

Arati C Furness

Attorney at Fears Nachawati PLLC

5473 Blair Rd.

Dallas, TX 75231

Arati C. Furness

Attorney at Fears Nachawati

5473 Blair Road

Dallas, TX 75231

Kelly L. Chermack

Attorney at Fears Nachawati

5473 Blair Road

Dallas, TX 75231

Defendant Attorneys

Richard B. North, Jr.

Attorney at Nelson, Mullins, Riley & Scarborough - Atlanta

201 17Th Street, Nw

Atlanta, GA 30363

Sanjay Ghosh

Attorney at Nelson, Mullins, Riley & Scarborough - Atlanta

201 17Th Street, Nw

Atlanta, GA 30363

Jennifer S. Heis

Attorney at Ulmer & Berne - Cincinnati

600 Vine Street

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Matthew B. Lerner

Attorney at Nelson Mullins - Atlanta

201 17Th Street

Atlanta, GA 30363

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) Attorney Appearance by Matthew B. Lerner filed by on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Lerner, Matthew) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

#14

(#14) Attorney Appearance by Sanjay Ghosh filed by on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Ghosh, Sanjay) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

#13

(#13) Order: the parties file a joint status report, on or before May 7, 2021 (see order for full details). Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 4/9/2021. (S,AL) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

#10

(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent C. R. Bard, Inc., Corporate Parent Becton Dickinson and Company for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated. (Heis, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

#9

No Description Available

#8

No Description Available

#7

No Description Available

#4

(#4) AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/11/2021. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 3/1/2021.] (Entered: 02/16/2021)

#3

(#3) *AMENDED By Doc. #6 *SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/9/2021. (MAP) *Modified on 2/18/2021 (MAP). [Transferred from azd on 3/1/2021.] (Entered: 02/11/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Attorney Appearance by Matthew B. Lerner filed by on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Lerner, Matthew) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Attorney Appearance by Sanjay Ghosh filed by on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Ghosh, Sanjay) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Order: the parties file a joint status report, on or before May 7, 2021 (see order for full details). Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 4/9/2021. (S,AL) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder [non-document]granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Kelly L. Chermack for Patricia A Pulfer and Rodney I Pulfer. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #12 ). Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 4/9/2021.(S,AL) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Motion for attorney Kelly Chermack to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 34660012387, filed by Rodney I Pulfer and Patricia A Pulfer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(S,DM) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder [non-document] granting Motion to withdraw Attorney Richard B. North, Jr. as to both defendants. (Related Doc #11 ) Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 3/9/2021.(S,AL) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketNotice to Attorney Matthew R. McCarley. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketNotice to Attorney Arati C. Furness. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Motion by Richard B. North, Jr. to withdraw as attorney filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Heis, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent C. R. Bard, Inc., Corporate Parent Becton Dickinson and Company for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated. (Heis, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketNotice by Clerk: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.13(b), C R Bard Incorporated & Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated are reminded of their requirement to file a corporate disclosure statement. (M,TL) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketRemark by Clerk: This case was transferred from the District of Arizona. All documents were docketed on Arizona's MDL master docket. See # Arizona docket 2:15md2641 for documents. Your PACER login will be required to access the docket/documents. (M,TL) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Amended Suggestion of Remand and Transfer Order (Fifth) signed by Judge David G. Campbell on 02/11/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certified Docket Sheet from AZ)(M,TL) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketJudge Jeffrey J. Helmick assigned to case pursuant to General Order 2019-17-1. (M,TL) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Arizona. Case number 2:19-cv-02710. Electronic file, transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketRemark: Transferring Case to the Northern District of Ohio via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 3/1/2021.] (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/11/2021. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 3/1/2021.] (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) *AMENDED By Doc. #6 *SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/9/2021. (MAP) *Modified on 2/18/2021 (MAP). [Transferred from azd on 3/1/2021.] (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • Docket(#2) This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-02710-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from azd on 3/1/2021.] (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16842952 filed by Rodney I Pulfer, Patricia A Pulfer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SLQ) [Transferred from azd on 3/1/2021.] (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where C.R. Bard, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kelly L. Chermack

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Arati Furness