This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/14/2022 at 08:36:56 (UTC).

Pugh v. Martinez Detention Facility

Case Summary

On 03/15/2022 Pugh filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Martinez Detention Facility. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Laurel Beeler, Jeffrey S. White and PSLC JNE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-01487

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Referral Judge

PSLC JNE

Presiding Judges

Laurel Beeler

Jeffrey S. White

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Terryonn D Pugh

Martinez, CA 94553

Defendants

Martinez Detention Facility

901 Court Street

Martinez, CA 94553

Contra Costa County

1025 Escobar Street

Martinez, CA 94553

A. Maloney

C. Golden

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Envelope

#3

(#3) Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Terryonn D. Pugh (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2022) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

#4

RESTRICTED

5 #5

Main Document

5 #1

Envelope

#6

(#6) CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

7 #7

Main Document

7 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#8

(#8) ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White Granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (dts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

#9

(#9) ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on April 25, 2022. Amended Complaint due by 5/23/2022. (dts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on April 25, 2022. Amended Complaint due by 5/23/2022. (dts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White Granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (dts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 04/01/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Terryonn D Pugh. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2022) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Inmate Statement of Account. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2022) Modified on 3/21/2022 (kmg, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Terryonn D. Pugh (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2022) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Contra Costa County, C. Golden, A. Maloney, Martinez Detention Facility. Filed byTerryonn D Pugh. Consent/Declination due by 4/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2022) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Martinez Detention Facility is a litigant

Latest cases where CONTRA COSTA COUNTY is a litigant