This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/04/2021 at 09:40:39 (UTC).

Pugh v. BMW Financial Services

Case Summary

On 10/05/2021 Pugh filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against BMW Financial Services. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judges overseeing this case are Camille D Bibles and Steven P Logan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01701

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Camille D Bibles

Steven P Logan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Demetris Lamar Pugh

Maricopa, AZ 85138

Defendant

BMW Financial Services

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

John Spencer Craiger

Attorney at Polsinelli PC - Phoenix, AZ

1 E Washington St., Ste. 1200

Phoenix, AZ 85004

 

Court Documents

18 #2

Proposed Order

18 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#18

(#18) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by BMW Financial Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Craiger, John) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

16 #1

Forms

#16

(#16) ORDER issued: Scheduling Conference set for 12/14/2021 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 501, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Steven P Logan. See Order for details and deadlines. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 11/2/21. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Form)(SJF) Doc. 17 correctly modified the time of the hearing to 3:30 PM Modified on 11/2/2021 (SJF). (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#15

(#15) ORDER governing these proceedings issued. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 11/2/21. (SJF) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#11

(#11) REQUEST BY NON-PRISONER PRO SE PARTY FOR ELECTRONIC NOTICING filed by Demetris Lamar Pugh. Pro se parties must promptly notify the Clerks Office, in writing, if there is a change in designated e-mail address or mailing address. (BAS) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

#10

(#10) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by BMW Financial Services: Certificate of Service re: Answer upon Demetris Pugh on October 15, 2021. (Craiger, John) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Proof of Service upon Axos Bank (non-party) on 9/14/2021 by Demetris Lamar Pugh. (WLP) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal /Complaint by BMW Financial Services.(Craiger, John) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

#7

#6

#5

#3

#2

1 #2

Exhibit

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by BMW Financial Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Craiger, John) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MINUTE ORDER: The Order issued at doc. #16 had the incorrect hearing time in the docket text. The correct date of the scheduling conference is 12/14/2021 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 501, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Steven P Logan as listed in the Order that was attached. The Clerk apologizes for any confusion this may have caused. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SJF) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER issued: Scheduling Conference set for 12/14/2021 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 501, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Steven P Logan. See Order for details and deadlines. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 11/2/21. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Form)(SJF) Doc. 17 correctly modified the time of the hearing to 3:30 PM Modified on 11/2/2021 (SJF). (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER governing these proceedings issued. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 11/2/21. (SJF) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • Docket(#14) MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Steven P Logan. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-21-1701-PHX-SPL. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • Docket(#13) Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) REQUEST BY NON-PRISONER PRO SE PARTY FOR ELECTRONIC NOTICING filed by Demetris Lamar Pugh. Pro se parties must promptly notify the Clerks Office, in writing, if there is a change in designated e-mail address or mailing address. (BAS) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by BMW Financial Services: Certificate of Service re: Answer upon Demetris Pugh on October 15, 2021. (Craiger, John) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Proof of Service upon Axos Bank (non-party) on 9/14/2021 by Demetris Lamar Pugh. (WLP) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal /Complaint by BMW Financial Services.(Craiger, John) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by BMW Financial Services. (Craiger, John) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Additional Attachments to Main Document re: 4 Notice of Deficiency (Text Only) Supplemental Civil Case Cover Sheet by Defendant BMW Financial Services. (Craiger, John) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to BMW Financial Services. (JAM) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by BMW Financial Services. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (JAM) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (JAM) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19936346. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Camille D Bibles. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-1701-PHX-CDB. Magistrate Election form attached. PLEASE NOTE: Plaintiff(s) and defendants that have already appeared in this case are required to file the attached Magistrate Election form within FOURTEEN (14) days of this filing. Please read attached instructions. (JAM) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pinal County Justice Court, case number CV2021001201. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19936346 filed by BMW Financial Services. (Craiger, John) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(JAM) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BMW FINANCIAL SERVICES NA INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Spencer Craiger(Designation Retained)