This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 08:53:58 (UTC).

Puffinberger et al v. 3M Company et al

Case Summary

On 02/11/2020 Puffinberger filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against 3M Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Irene C. Berger. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00122

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Irene C. Berger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gilbert "John" Puffinberger

Defendants

Navistar Inc.

Utility Trailer Manufacturing Company

Sundyne Corporation

BW/IP, Inc.

Paccar Inc.

Industrial Holdings Corporation

Warren Pumps LLC

Cashco, Inc.

Motion Control Industries, Inc.

Great Dane Limited Partnership

Barnett Tool & Engineering

AGCO Corporation

Uniroyal Holding, Inc.

Honeywell International, Inc.

Truck Enterprises, Inc.

Freightliner Trucks

Mack Trucks, Inc.

Volvo Group North America, LLC

T&L Supply Co.

107 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Victoria L. Antion

Attorney at MOTLEY RICE

P. O. Box 1792

Mount Pleasant, SC 29465

Scott A. McGee

Attorney at ANTION MCGEE LAW GROUP

2Nd Floor, Suite B, 341 Chaplin Road

Morgantown, WV 26501

Defendant Attorneys

James Michael Evans

Attorney at SCHNADER HARRISON SEGAL & LEWIS

Fifth Avenue Place, Suite 2700, 120 Fifth Avenue

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Jill D. Helbling

Attorney at GORDON REES SCULLY MANSUKHANI

Suite 638, 1025 Main Street

Wheeling, WV 26003

Other Attorneys

Ollie M. Harton

Attorney at HAWKINS PARNELL THACKSTON & YOUNG

4000 Suntrust Plaza, 303 Peachtree Street, N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30308-3243

Houston A. Bragg

Attorney at HAWKINS PARNELL & YOUNG

Suite 1601, 707 Virginia Street East

Charleston, WV 25301

Robert H. Sweeney, Jr.

Attorney at JENKINS FENSTERMAKER

P. O. Box 2688

Huntington, WV 25726-2688

Ryan M. Krescanko

Attorney at MARSHALL DENNEHEY WARNER COLEMAN & GOGGIN

Suite 700, 501 Grant Street

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Anne D. Harman

Attorney at DINSMORE & SHOHL

2100 Market Street

Wheeling, WV 26003

Brian S. Lindsay

Attorney at JENKINS FENSTERMAKER

P. O. Box 2688

Huntington, WV 25726-2688

Charles K. Gould

Attorney at JENKINS FENSTERMAKER

P. O. Box 2688

Huntington, WV 25726-2688

 

Court Documents

#16

#15

#14

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#13

#12

#11

10 #9

Exhibit

10 #8

Exhibit

10 #7

Exhibit

10 #6

Exhibit

10 #5

Exhibit

3 #5

Exhibit 5

3 #4

Exhibit 4

3 #3

Exhibit 3

3 #2

Exhibit 2

3 #1

Exhibit 1

#3

#2

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT by Clerk, Circuit Court of Kanawha County, West Virginia, of receipt of case file pursuant to the #13 Memorandum Opinion and Order remanding this civil action. (ts)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #2 Notice of Change of Attorney Information. ERROR: Notice did not contain electronic signature. CORRECTION: Electronic signature added and image replaced. (kew)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) LETTER to Clerk, Kanawha County Circuit Court, from Clerk, Southern District of West Virginia dated 2/13/2020, re: remanding case. (lca)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) TRANSMITTED CERTIFIED COPY of #13 Memorandum Opinion and Order to attorneys and any unrepresented party. (lca)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting #3 MOTION to Remand to Circuit Court and that this case be remanded to the Circuit Court of Kanawha County, West Virginia; directing that any motion seeking an award of costs and fees associated with the removal of this action be filed no later than 3/6/2020. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 2/13/2020. (cc: counsel of record; Circuit Court of Kanawha County, any unrepresented party) (lca)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Jill D. Helbling on behalf of Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Paccar Inc. (Helbling, Jill)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 3/4/2020. Rule 26(f) Meeting 3/11/2020. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 3/18/2020. Scheduling Conference at 03:30 PM on 4/1/2020. Entry of Scheduling Order 4/8/2020. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 4/15/2020. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 2/13/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (ts)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) OPPOSITION by Paccar Inc. to #3 EMERGENCY MOTION by Francis Puffinberger, Gilbert "John" Puffinberger for Remand and for Fees and Costs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit)(Evans, James)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RESPONSE by Francis Puffinberger, Gilbert "John" Puffinberger in opposition to #5 MOTION by Paccar Inc. for Permission to Conduct Limited Discovery in Order to Make a Record of Dispositive Facts Relevant to Removal (McGee, Scott)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Daimler Trucks North America LLC (Evans, James)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Paccar Inc. (Evans, James)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STATEMENT OF INTENTION REGARDING CASE PROGRESSION by Paccar Inc., Daimler Trucks North America LLC. (Evans, James) (Modified on 2/18/2020 to add party filer) (kew).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION by Paccar Inc. for Permission to Conduct Limited Discovery in Order to Make a Record of Dispositive Facts Relevant to Removal (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 SS Record Excerpts, #3 Proposed Order)(Evans, James)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER FOR ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES OF CIVIL ACTIONS ASSIGNED TO JUDGE IRENE C. BERGER ENTERED NOVEMBER 12, 2019. This matter referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn for Discovery. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) EMERGENCY MOTION by Francis Puffinberger, Gilbert "John" Puffinberger for Remand and for Fees and Costs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(McGee, Scott)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY INFORMATION by Scott A. McGee updating name and/or firm information on behalf of Francis Puffinberger, Gilbert "John" Puffinberger. (McGee, Scott) (Modified on 2/19/2020 to correct signature and replace image) (kew).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketCASE assigned to Judge Irene C. Berger. (klc) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Paccar Inc. with summons, complaint and docket sheet from Circuit Court of Kanawha County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7541787. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (st) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Truck Enterprises, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Barnett Tool & Engineering is a litigant

Latest cases where Great Dane LP is a litigant

Latest cases where Freightliner Trucks is a litigant