This case was last updated from PACER on 08/17/2021 at 08:40:57 (UTC).

Puerto Rico Fast Ferries LLC v. SeaTran Marine LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/18/2021 Puerto Rico Fast Ferries LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SeaTran Marine LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District. The Judge overseeing this case is Gustavo A. Gelpi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-01294

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gustavo A. Gelpi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Puerto Rico Fast Ferries LLC

Ave. Baldorioty De Castro 8020 Tartak Street

Carolina, PR 00979

Defendants

SeaTran Marine LLC

Mr. Cade LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mauricio O. Muniz-Luciano

Attorney at Marini Pietrantoni Muniz LLC

250 Ponce De Leon Ave, Suite 900

San Juan, PR 00918

Valerie M. Blay-Soler

250 Ponce De Leon Ave, Suite 900

San Juan, PR 00918

Defendant Attorneys

Arlyn Gonzalez-Diaz

Attorney at Cancio, Nadal, Rivera & Diaz

P.O. Box 364966

San Juan, PR 00936-4966

Fernando J. Valderrabano-Marina

Attorney at Cancio, Nadal, Rivera & Diaz

P.O. Box 364966

San Juan, PR 00936-4966

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) Motion to allow STEWART PECK to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-7413074) filed by Fernando J. Valderrabano-Marina on behalf of Mr. Cade LLC, SeaTran Marine LLC Responses due by 8/30/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Valderrabano-Marina, Fernando) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

#19

(#19) Motion to allow JAMES W THURMAN to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-7413083) filed by Fernando J. Valderrabano-Marina on behalf of Mr. Cade LLC, SeaTran Marine LLC Responses due by 8/30/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Valderrabano-Marina, Fernando) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

18 #1

Exhibit Master Agreement

#18

(#18) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction as to Puerto Rico Fast Ferries LLC filed by Fernando J. Valderrabano-Marina on behalf of SeaTran Marine LLC Responses due by 8/27/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Master Agreement)(Valderrabano-Marina, Fernando) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

#15

(#15) ***FILED IN ERROR - Incorrect Signing Format as to Applicant*** Motion to allow JAMES W THURMAN to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-7413083) filed by Fernando J. Valderrabano-Marina on behalf of Mr. Cade LLC, SeaTran Marine LLC Responses due by 8/27/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Valderrabano-Marina, Fernando) Modified on 8/16/2021 (mg). (Entered: 08/13/2021)

#14

(#14) ***FILED IN ERROR - Incorrect Signing Format as to Applicant*** Motion to allow STEWART PECK to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-7413074) filed by Fernando J. Valderrabano-Marina on behalf of Mr. Cade LLC, SeaTran Marine LLC Responses due by 8/27/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Valderrabano-Marina, Fernando) Modified on 8/16/2021 (mg). (Entered: 08/13/2021)

#12

(#12) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, filed by Puerto Rico Fast Ferries LLC filed by Fernando J. Valderrabano-Marina on behalf of Mr. Cade LLC, SeaTran Marine LLC Responses due by 7/28/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Valderrabano-Marina, Fernando) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Puerto Rico Fast Ferries LLC upon Mr. Cade LLC served on 6/23/2021, answer due 7/14/2021. (Muniz-Luciano, Mauricio) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

6 #1

Summons

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Mr. Cade LLC, SeaTran Marine LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

4 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#4

(#4) MOTION Submitting Civil Cover Sheet re: #3 Notice of Defective Filing filed by Mauricio O. Muniz-Luciano on behalf of Puerto Rico Fast Ferries LLC Responses due by 7/6/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Related document(s) #3 ) (Muniz-Luciano, Mauricio) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

#3

(#4) MOTION Submitting Civil Cover Sheet re: #3 Notice of Defective Filing filed by Mauricio O. Muniz-Luciano on behalf of Puerto Rico Fast Ferries LLC Responses due by 7/6/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Related document(s) #3 ) (Muniz-Luciano, Mauricio) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

2 #2

Summons Mr. Cade LLC

2 #1

Summons SeaTran Marine LLC

#2

(#2) MOTION Submitting Summons re: #1 Complaint, filed by Puerto Rico Fast Ferries LLC filed by Mauricio O. Muniz-Luciano on behalf of Puerto Rico Fast Ferries LLC Responses due by 7/6/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Summons SeaTran Marine LLC, #2 Summons Mr. Cade LLC)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Muniz-Luciano, Mauricio) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

1 #2

Category Sheet

#1

(#12) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, filed by Puerto Rico Fast Ferries LLC filed by Fernando J. Valderrabano-Marina on behalf of Mr. Cade LLC, SeaTran Marine LLC Responses due by 7/28/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Valderrabano-Marina, Fernando) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Motion to allow STEWART PECK to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-7413074) filed by Fernando J. Valderrabano-Marina on behalf of Mr. Cade LLC, SeaTran Marine LLC Responses due by 8/30/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Valderrabano-Marina, Fernando) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Motion to allow JAMES W THURMAN to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-7413083) filed by Fernando J. Valderrabano-Marina on behalf of Mr. Cade LLC, SeaTran Marine LLC Responses due by 8/30/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Valderrabano-Marina, Fernando) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk. ***FILED IN ERROR - Motion filed with Incorrect Signing Format as to Applicant*** re: dk no. #14 Motion to allow STEWART PECK to appear Pro Hac Vice, dk no. #15 Motion to allow JAMES W THURMAN to appear Pro Hac Vice, 17 Order on Motion to Appear PHV, 16 Order on Motion to Appear PHV. (mg) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction as to Puerto Rico Fast Ferries LLC filed by Fernando J. Valderrabano-Marina on behalf of SeaTran Marine LLC Responses due by 8/27/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Master Agreement)(Valderrabano-Marina, Fernando) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ***FILED IN ERROR - Motion filed with Incorrect Signing Format as to Applicant*** ORDER: Granting #14 Motion to Appear PHV by Fernando J. Valderrabano-Marina on behalf of Mr. Cade LLC. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 08/13/2021. (mb) Modified on 8/16/2021 (mg). (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ***FILED IN ERROR - Motion filed with Incorrect Signing Format as to Applicant*** ORDER: Granting #15 Motion to Appear PHV by Fernando J. Valderrabano-Marina on behalf of Mr. Cade LLC, Sea Tran Marine LLC. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 08/13/2021. (mb) Modified on 8/16/2021 (mg). (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ***FILED IN ERROR - Incorrect Signing Format as to Applicant*** Motion to allow JAMES W THURMAN to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-7413083) filed by Fernando J. Valderrabano-Marina on behalf of Mr. Cade LLC, SeaTran Marine LLC Responses due by 8/27/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Valderrabano-Marina, Fernando) Modified on 8/16/2021 (mg). (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ***FILED IN ERROR - Incorrect Signing Format as to Applicant*** Motion to allow STEWART PECK to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-7413074) filed by Fernando J. Valderrabano-Marina on behalf of Mr. Cade LLC, SeaTran Marine LLC Responses due by 8/27/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Valderrabano-Marina, Fernando) Modified on 8/16/2021 (mg). (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER: Granting as requested #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or otherwise Plead. Answer deadline due by August 13, 2021. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 7/15/2021. (MES) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, filed by Puerto Rico Fast Ferries LLC filed by Fernando J. Valderrabano-Marina on behalf of Mr. Cade LLC, SeaTran Marine LLC Responses due by 7/28/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Valderrabano-Marina, Fernando) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Fernando J. Valderrabano-Marina on behalf of Mr. Cade LLC, SeaTran Marine LLC (Valderrabano-Marina, Fernando) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Valerie M. Blay-Soler on behalf of Puerto Rico Fast Ferries LLC (Blay-Soler, Valerie) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Puerto Rico Fast Ferries LLC upon SeaTran Marine LLC served on 6/23/2021, answer due 7/14/2021. (Muniz-Luciano, Mauricio) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Puerto Rico Fast Ferries LLC upon Mr. Cade LLC served on 6/23/2021, answer due 7/14/2021. (Muniz-Luciano, Mauricio) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Mr. Cade LLC, SeaTran Marine LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (arg) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION Submitting Civil Cover Sheet re: #3 Notice of Defective Filing filed by Mauricio O. Muniz-Luciano on behalf of Puerto Rico Fast Ferries LLC Responses due by 7/6/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Related document(s) #3 ) (Muniz-Luciano, Mauricio) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING.Civil Cover Sheet (JS44) is incomplete. All the boxes are empty. Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 6/22/2021. (arg) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION Submitting Summons re: #1 Complaint, filed by Puerto Rico Fast Ferries LLC filed by Mauricio O. Muniz-Luciano on behalf of Puerto Rico Fast Ferries LLC Responses due by 7/6/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Summons SeaTran Marine LLC, #2 Summons Mr. Cade LLC)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Muniz-Luciano, Mauricio) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Mr. Cade LLC, SeaTran Marine LLC ( Filing fee $402 receipt number 0104-7344804.), filed by Puerto Rico Fast Ferries LLC. Service due by 9/16/2021, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Muniz-Luciano, Mauricio) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Seatran Marine L L C is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mauricio Oscar Muniz-Luciano

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Valerie M. Blay-Soler