This case was last updated from PACER on 09/09/2019 at 07:45:12 (UTC).

Puerto Rico Asphalt, LLC v. Betterecycling Corporation

Case Summary

On 07/11/2019 Puerto Rico Asphalt, LLC filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against Betterecycling Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District. The Judge overseeing this case is Carmen C. Cerezo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01662

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Puerto Rico District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Carmen C. Cerezo

 

Party Details

Appellant

Puerto Rico Asphalt, LLC

Appellee

Betterecycling Corporation

Interested Parties

U.S. Trustee

Economic Development Bank for Puerto Rico

FirstBank Puerto Rico

Banco Santander de Puerto Rico

Banco Popular de Puerto Rico

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Myrna L. Ruiz-Olmo

Attorney at MRO Attorneys at Law, LLC

Po Box 367819

San Juan, PR 00936-7819

Appellee Attorney

Wigberto Lugo-Mender

Attorney at Lugo Mender & Co.

Carr 165 Torre 1 Suite 501

Guaynabo, PR 00968

Interested Party Attorneys

Monsita Lecaroz-Arribas

Attorney at U. S. Trustee Office

Ochoa Bldg. Suite 301, 500 Tanca St.

San Juan, PR 00901-1922

Luis C. Marini-Biaggi

Attorney at Marini Pietrantoni Muniz LLC

250 Ponce De Leon Ave., Suite 900,

San Juan, PR 00918

Valerie M. Blay-Soler

250 Ponce De Leon Ave, Suite 900

San Juan, PR 00918

Carolina Velaz-Rivero

Attorney at Marini Pietrantoni Muniz LLC

255 Ponce De Leon Ave, Suite 500, Mcs Plaza

San Juan, PR 00917

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) ***FILED IN ERROR - Wrong Case Number.*** MOTION for extension of time until September 10, 2019 to file Appellant's Brief filed by Myrna L. Ruiz-Olmo on behalf of Puerto Rico Asphalt, LLC Responses due by 9/10/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ruiz-Olmo, Myrna) Modified to file in error on 9/3/2019 (idg). (Entered: 08/27/2019)

12 #20

7 Certified Docket

12 #18

5 13 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part II Dkt 283_Part13

12 #17

5 12 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part II Dkt 283_Part12

12 #16

5 11 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part II Dkt 283_Part11

12 #14

5 9 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part II Dkt 283_Part9

12 #13

5 8 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part II Dkt 283_Part8

12 #12

5 7 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part II Dkt 283_Part7

12 #11

5 6 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part II Dkt 283_Part6

12 #10

5 5 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part II Dkt 283_Part5

12 #9

5 4 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part II Dkt 283_Part4

12 #8

5 3 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part II Dkt 283_Part3

12 #7

5 2 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part II Dkt 283_Part2

12 #6

5 1 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part II Dkt 283_Part1

12 #5

4 3 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part I_Part3

12 #3

4 1 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part I_Part1

12 #2

Appellant's Statement of Issues

12 #1

Appellant's Designation of Contents

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #13 MOTION for extension of time until September 10, 2019 to file Appellant's Brief. ***FILED IN ERROR - Wrong Case Number.*** (idg) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ***FILED IN ERROR - Wrong Case Number.*** MOTION for extension of time until September 10, 2019 to file Appellant's Brief filed by Myrna L. Ruiz-Olmo on behalf of Puerto Rico Asphalt, LLC Responses due by 9/10/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ruiz-Olmo, Myrna) Modified to file in error on 9/3/2019 (idg). (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) CERTIFICATION for Transmittal of Complete Record on Appeal from Bankruptcy Court, filed by Puerto Rico Asphalt, LLC. Appellant Brief due by 8/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Appellant's Designation of Contents, #2 Appellant's Statement of Issues, #3 4 1 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part I_Part1, #4 4 2 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part I_Part2, #5 4 3 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part I_Part3, #6 5 1 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part II Dkt 283_Part1, #7 5 2 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part II Dkt 283_Part2, #8 5 3 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part II Dkt 283_Part3, #9 5 4 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part II Dkt 283_Part4, #10 5 5 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part II Dkt 283_Part5, #11 5 6 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part II Dkt 283_Part6, #12 5 7 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part II Dkt 283_Part7, #13 5 8 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part II Dkt 283_Part8, #14 5 9 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part II Dkt 283_Part9, #15 5 10 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part II Dkt 283_Part10, #16 5 11 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part II Dkt 283_Part11, #17 5 12 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part II Dkt 283_Part12, #18 5 13 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part II Dkt 283_Part13, #19 6 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part III, #20 7 Certified Docket)(babk) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) REPLY to Response to Motion : MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY TO OBJECTION TO URGENT MOTION FOR STAY PENDING APPEAL AND TENDERING REPLY filed by Puerto Rico Asphalt, LLC Re: #5 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Notice of Intent to Respond filed by Economic Development Bank for Puerto Rico, FirstBank Puerto Rico, Banco Popular de Puerto Rico, Banco Santander de Puerto Rico, #4 Emergency MOTION to Stay proceedings before the Bankruptcy Court re: Notice of Docket Text Modification, #3 Emergency MOTION to Stay proceedings before the Bankruptcy Court filed by Puerto Rico Asphalt, LLC filed by Puerto Rico Asphalt, LLC filed by Puerto Rico Asphalt, LLC. (Ruiz-Olmo, Myrna) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) OPPOSITION to Puerto Rico Asphalt's Allegedly Urgent Motion for Stay Pending Appeal filed by Banco Popular de Puerto Rico, Banco Santander de Puerto Rico, Economic Development Bank for Puerto Rico, FirstBank Puerto Rico Re: #4 Emergency MOTION to Stay proceedings before the Bankruptcy Court re: Notice of Docket Text Modification, #3 Emergency MOTION to Stay proceedings before the Bankruptcy Court filed by Puerto Rico Asphalt, LLC filed by Puerto Rico Asphalt, LLC filed by Banco Popular de Puerto Rico, Banco Santander de Puerto Rico, Economic Development Bank for Puerto Rico, FirstBank Puerto Rico. (Blay-Soler, Valerie) Modified caps lock on 7/30/2019 (idg). (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance Carolina Velaz-Rivero by Carolina Velaz-Rivero on behalf of Banco Popular de Puerto Rico, Banco Santander de Puerto Rico, Economic Development Bank for Puerto Rico, FirstBank Puerto Rico (Velaz-Rivero, Carolina) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance Luis C. Marini-Biaggi by Luis C. Marini-Biaggi on behalf of Banco Popular de Puerto Rico, Banco Santander de Puerto Rico, Economic Development Bank for Puerto Rico, FirstBank Puerto Rico (Marini-Biaggi, Luis) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #7 Notice of Appearance. ***FILED IN ERROR - Lacking electronic signature (S/) pursuant to the 2014 CM/ECF Revised Manual, II.C.3.b. Counsel to re-file.*** (idg) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #6 Notice of Appearance. ***FILED IN ERROR - Lacking electronic signature (S/) pursuant to the 2014 CM/ECF Revised Manual, II.C.3.b. Counsel to re-file.*** (idg) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ***FILED IN ERROR - Lacking electronic signature (S/) pursuant to the 2014 CM/ECF Revised Manual, II.C.3.b. Counsel to re-file.*** NOTICE of Appearance Carolina Velaz Rivero by Carolina Velaz-Rivero on behalf of Banco Popular de Puerto Rico, Banco Santander de Puerto Rico, Economic Development Bank for Puerto Rico, FirstBank Puerto Rico (Velaz-Rivero, Carolina) Modified to file in error on 7/24/2019 (idg). (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ***FILED IN ERROR - Lacking electronic signature (S/) pursuant to the 2014 CM/ECF Revised Manual, II.C.3.b. Counsel to re-file.*** NOTICE of Appearance Luis Marini Biaggi by Luis C. Marini-Biaggi on behalf of Banco Popular de Puerto Rico, Banco Santander de Puerto Rico, Economic Development Bank for Puerto Rico, FirstBank Puerto Rico (Marini-Biaggi, Luis) Modified to file in error on 7/24/2019 (idg). (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Notice of Intent to Respond filed by Valerie M. Blay-Soler on behalf of Banco Popular de Puerto Rico, FirstBank Puerto Rico, Economic Development Bank for Puerto Rico, Banco Santander de Puerto Rico Responses due by 7/30/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Blay-Soler, Valerie) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Emergency MOTION to Stay proceedings before the Bankruptcy Court re: Notice of Docket Text Modification, #3 Emergency MOTION to Stay proceedings before the Bankruptcy Court filed by Puerto Rico Asphalt, LLC filed by Myrna L. Ruiz-Olmo on behalf of Puerto Rico Asphalt, LLC Responses due by 7/29/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s)[], #3 ) (Ruiz-Olmo, Myrna) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #3 Emergency MOTION to Stay proceedings before the Bankruptcy Court. ***FILED IN ERROR - Wrong Case Number. To be re-filed.*** (idg) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ***FILED IN ERROR - Wrong Case Number. To be re-filed.*** Emergency MOTION to Stay proceedings before the Bankruptcy Court filed by Myrna L. Ruiz-Olmo on behalf of Puerto Rico Asphalt, LLC Responses due by 7/26/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ruiz-Olmo, Myrna) Modified to file in error on 7/15/2019 (idg). (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • (#2) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Carmen C. Cerezo (arg) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) TRANSMITTAL of Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court, filed by Puerto Rico Asphalt, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal and Election to USDC, #2 Certified Docket_Part1, #3 Certified Docket_Part2)(babk) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.