This case was last updated from PACER on 12/28/2019 at 07:58:54 (UTC).

Puerto Rico Asphalt, LLC v. Banco Popular de Puerto Rico et al

Case Summary

On 10/29/2019 Puerto Rico Asphalt, LLC filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against Banco Popular de Puerto Rico. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District. The Judge overseeing this case is Daniel R. Dominguez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-02020

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Daniel R. Dominguez

 

Party Details

Appellant

Puerto Rico Asphalt, LLC

Debtor

Betteroads Asphalt, LLC

Appellees

St James Security, Inc.

Sargeant Marine, Inc.

Facsimil Paper Connection, Inc.

Economic Development Bank for Puerto Rico

Banco Popular de Puerto Rico

FirstBank Puerto Rico

Sargeant Trading Limited

Banco Santander Puerto Rico

Interested Party

US Trustee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Myrna L. Ruiz-Olmo

Attorney at MRO Attorneys at Law, LLC

Po Box 367819

San Juan, PR 00936-7819

Debtor Attorneys

Alexis A. Betancourt-Vincenty

Attorney at Lugo Mender Group LLC

100 Street 165 Suite 501

Guaynabo, PR 00968-8052

Wigberto Lugo-Mender

Attorney at Lugo Mender & Co.

Carr 165 Torre 1 Suite 501

Guaynabo, PR 00968

Appellee Attorneys

Israel O. Alicea-Luciano

Capital Center Building, South Tower, 239 Arterial Hostos Ave., Suite 305

San Juan, PR 00918

Alexis Fuentes-Hernandez

Attorney at Fuentes Law Offices

P.O. Box 9022726

San Juan, PR 00902-2726

Camille N. Somoza-Castello

Attorney at Ferraiuoli LLC

Po Box 195168

San Juan, PR 00919-5168

Sonia Colon-Colon

390 N Orange Avenue, Suite 2300

Orlando, FL 32801

Gustavo A. Chico-Barris

Attorney at Ferraiuoli LLC

Po Box 195168

San Juan, PR 00919-5168

Luis C. Marini-Biaggi

Attorney at Marini Pietrantoni Muniz LLC

250 Ponce De Leon Ave., Suite 900,

San Juan, PR 00918

Carolina Velaz-Rivero

Attorney at Marini Pietrantoni Muniz LLC

255 Ponce De Leon Ave, Suite 500, Mcs Plaza

San Juan, PR 00917

Valerie M. Blay-Soler

250 Ponce De Leon Ave, Suite 900

San Juan, PR 00918

Mauricio O. Muniz-Luciano

Attorney at Marini Pietrantoni Muniz LLC

255 Ponce De Leon Ave, Mcs Plaza Suite 500

San Juan, PR 00917

Ignacio Labarca-Morales

Attorney at Marini Pietrantoni Muniz LLC

250 Ponce De Leon Ave., Suite 900,

San Juan, PR 00918

Fausto D. Godreau

Attorney at Latimer, Biaggi, Rachid & Godreau

Po Box 9022512

San Juan, PR 00902-2512

Rafael A. Gonzalez-Valiente

Attorney at Latimer, Biaggi, Rachid & Godreau

Po Box 9022512

San Juan, PR 00902-2512

Interested Party Attorney

Monsita Lecaroz-Arribas

Attorney at U. S. Trustee Office

Ochoa Bldg. Suite 301, 500 Tanca St.

San Juan, PR 00901-1922

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) STANDING ORDER RE CODE OF CIVILITY. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 8/7/2017.(gav) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

#6

(#6) First MOTION for extension of time until February 3, 2020 to to file Appellant's Brief filed by Myrna L. Ruiz-Olmo on behalf of Puerto Rico Asphalt, LLC Responses due by 1/9/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ruiz-Olmo, Myrna) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

#5

(#5) MOTION to Consolidate Cases on Appeal filed by Jonathan Camacho-Villamil on behalf of Banco Popular de Puerto Rico, Banco Santander Puerto Rico, Economic Development Bank for Puerto Rico, FirstBank Puerto Rico Responses due by 1/3/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Camacho-Villamil, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

3 #29

Cerrtified Docket_Part1

3 #28

Appellant's Record on Appeal Part 10

3 #27

Appellant's Record on Appeal Part 9_Part3

3 #26

Appellant's Record on Appeal Part 9_Part2

3 #25

Appellant's Record on Appeal Part 9_Part1

3 #24

Appellant's Record on Appeal Part 8

3 #23

Appellant's Record on Appeal Part 7_Part9

3 #22

Appellant's Record on Appeal Part 7_Part8

3 #21

Appellant's Record on Appeal Part 7_Part7

3 #20

Appellant's Record on Appeal Part 7_Part6

3 #9

Appellant's Record on Appeal Part 3_Part4

3 #8

Appellant's Record on Appeal Part 3_Part3

3 #5

Appellant's Record on Appeal Part 2

3 #4

Appellant's Record on Appeal Part 1_Part3

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATION for Transmittal of Complete Record on Appeal from Bankruptcy Court, filed by Puerto Rico Asphalt, LLC. Appellant Brief due by 12/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Appellant's Designation of Items, #2 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part 1_Part1, #3 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part 1_Part2, #4 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part 1_Part3, #5 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part 2, #6 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part 3_Part1, #7 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part 3_Part2, #8 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part 3_Part3, #9 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part 3_Part4, #10 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part 4, #11 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part 5_Part1, #12 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part 5_Part2, #13 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part 6_Part1, #14 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part 6_Part2, #15 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part 7_Part1, #16 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part 7_Part2, #17 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part 7_Part3, #18 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part 7_Part4, #19 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part 7_Part5, #20 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part 7_Part6, #21 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part 7_Part7, #22 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part 7_Part8, #23 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part 7_Part9, #24 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part 8, #25 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part 9_Part1, #26 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part 9_Part2, #27 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part 9_Part3, #28 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part 10, #29 Cerrtified Docket_Part1, #30 Cerrtified Docket_Part2, #31 Cerrtified Docket_Part3, #32 Cerrtified Docket_Part4)(babk) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) STANDING ORDER RE CODE OF CIVILITY. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 8/7/2017.(gav) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) First MOTION for extension of time until February 3, 2020 to to file Appellant's Brief filed by Myrna L. Ruiz-Olmo on behalf of Puerto Rico Asphalt, LLC Responses due by 1/9/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ruiz-Olmo, Myrna) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Consolidate Cases on Appeal filed by Jonathan Camacho-Villamil on behalf of Banco Popular de Puerto Rico, Banco Santander Puerto Rico, Economic Development Bank for Puerto Rico, FirstBank Puerto Rico Responses due by 1/3/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Camacho-Villamil, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • (#4) ORDER. Appellant's brief is due on or before December 27, 2019. Appellee's brief is due 30 days thereafter. Briefs must comply with Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8014. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 11/27/2019. (EA) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CERTIFICATION for Transmittal of Complete Record on Appeal from Bankruptcy Court, filed by Puerto Rico Asphalt, LLC. Appellant Brief due by 12/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Appellant's Designation of Items, #2 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part 1_Part1, #3 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part 1_Part2, #4 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part 1_Part3, #5 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part 2, #6 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part 3_Part1, #7 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part 3_Part2, #8 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part 3_Part3, #9 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part 3_Part4, #10 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part 4, #11 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part 5_Part1, #12 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part 5_Part2, #13 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part 6_Part1, #14 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part 6_Part2, #15 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part 7_Part1, #16 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part 7_Part2, #17 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part 7_Part3, #18 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part 7_Part4, #19 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part 7_Part5, #20 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part 7_Part6, #21 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part 7_Part7, #22 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part 7_Part8, #23 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part 7_Part9, #24 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part 8, #25 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part 9_Part1, #26 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part 9_Part2, #27 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part 9_Part3, #28 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part 10, #29 Cerrtified Docket_Part1, #30 Cerrtified Docket_Part2, #31 Cerrtified Docket_Part3, #32 Cerrtified Docket_Part4)(babk) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • (#2) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Daniel R. Dominguez (arg) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) TRANSMITTAL of Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court, filed by Puerto Rico Asphalt, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal and Election to USDC, #2 Order dkt 271, #3 Order dkt 273, #4 Order dkt 426, #5 Order dkt 434, #6 Order dkt 454, #7 Order dkt 480, #8 Order dkt 520_Part1, #9 Order dkt 520_Part2, #10 Order dkt 520_Part3, #11 Order dkt 520_Part4, #12 Order dkt 521, #13 Order dkt 522, #14 Docket 523, #15 Certified Docket_Part1, #16 Certified Docket_Part2, #17 Certified Docket_Part3, #18 Certified Docket_Part4, #19 Certified Docket_Part5, #20 Certified Docket_Part6, #21 Certified Docket_Part7)(babk) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Facsimil Paper Connection, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where ST. JAMES SECURITY, INC. is a litigant