This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/27/2021 at 10:24:17 (UTC).

Puchala v. School House Apts., LLC

Case Summary

On 02/26/2021 Puchala filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against School House Apts , LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Rhode Island District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Mary S. McElroy and Lincoln D. Almond. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00094

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mary S. McElroy

Referral Judge

Lincoln D. Almond

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jennifer Puchala

Defendant

School House Apts., LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Thomas A. Tarro, III

Kris Marotti

Defendant Attorneys

Rajaram Suryanarayan

Michael A. Milas

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for 5/13/2021 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Mary S. McElroy. The court will send call-in information to counsel by email. (Urizandi, Nisshy) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Milas on behalf of School House Apts., LLC (Milas, Michael) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Defendant, School House Apts., LLC's ANSWER to Complaint by School House Apts., LLC.(Suryanarayan, Rajaram) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Rajaram Suryanarayan on behalf of School House Apts., LLC (Suryanarayan, Rajaram) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennifer Puchala. School House Apts., LLC served on 3/1/2021, answer due 3/22/2021. (Tarro, Thomas) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to School House Apts., LLC. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number 0103-1597806 ), filed by Jennifer Puchala. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Tarro, Thomas) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to School House Apts., LLC. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number 0103-1597806 ), filed by Jennifer Puchala. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Tarro, Thomas) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less