This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/05/2019 at 07:32:26 (UTC).

Public Lighting Authority of Detroit v. Leotek Electronics USA LLC

Case Summary

On 05/06/2019 Public Lighting Authority of Detroit filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Leotek Electronics USA LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Arthur J. Tarnow and R. Steven Whalen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-11327

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Arthur J. Tarnow

Referral Judge

R. Steven Whalen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Public Lighting Authority of Detroit

Defendant

Leotek Electronics USA LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kevin J. Campbell

Attorney at Floyd E. Allen & Associates, P.C.

3011 West Grand Boulevard, Suite 2500

Detroit, MI 48202

Luis E. Gomez

Attorney at Garcia Law Group, PLLC

3011 West Grand Blvd., Suite 2500

Detroit, MI 48202

Charles N. Raimi

Attorney at Detroit Medical Center

4707 St. Antoine, Suite W514

Detroit, MI 48201

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Index of Exhibits

1 #2

Exhibit 1

1 #3

Exhibit 2

1 #4

Exhibit 3

1 #5

Exhibit 4

1 #6

Exhibit 5

1 #7

Exhibit 6

1 #8

Exhibit 7

#2

#3

#4

#5

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Charles N. Raimi on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Raimi, Charles) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Public Lighting Authority of Detroit served on 5/8/2019, answer due 5/29/2019. (Campbell, Kevin) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Luis E. Gomez appearing on behalf of Public Lighting Authority of Detroit (Gomez, Luis) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (NAhm) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS Issued for *Leotek Electronics USA LLC* (NAhm) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Public Lighting Authority of Detroit against Leotek Electronics USA LLC with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7228159 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Santa Clara. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7) (Campbell, Kevin) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LEOTEK ELECTRONICS USA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kevin J. Campbell

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Charles N. Raimi