This case was last updated from PACER on 07/15/2019 at 11:33:07 (UTC).

PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY

Case Summary

On 03/28/2019 PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY filed a Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act lawsuit against U S DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ketanji Brown Jackson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00888

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ketanji Brown Jackson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY

962 Wayne Ave., Suite 610

Silver Spring, MD 20910

Defendants

DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY

U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paula Naomi Dinerstein

Attorney at PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY

962 Wayne Avenue, Suite 610

Silver Spring, MD 20910

Defendant Attorney

Katherine Boyd Palmer-Ball

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

555 Fourth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY.(Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

1 #5

Summons USAODC Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet cover sheet

3 #1

Notice and Consent

#4

(#4) GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Courts instructions for briefing motions and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 4/11/2019. (lckbj1) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

1 #3

Summons Navy Summons

#7

(#7) NOTICE Regarding Intent to File Answer by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY (Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

#6

(#6) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

1 #4

Summons AG Summons

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Boyd Palmer-Ball on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY (Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

#9

(#9) Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

#2

(#2) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (zef, ) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

6 #1

Text of Proposed Order

9 #1

Text of Proposed Order

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTE ORDER. In light of the representations in the parties' #9 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before 8/23/2019, the parties shall file a further joint status report, which shall include a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 6/25/2019. (lckbj1) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall review this Court's #4 General Order and Guidelines Applicable to FOIA Cases, and promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for disclosure or briefing motions for summary judgment, on or before 6/13/2019. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 5/30/2019. (lckbj1) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY.(Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE Regarding Intent to File Answer by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY (Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTE ORDER granting, for good cause shown, #6 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before 5/29/2019. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 5/20/2019. (lckbj1) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Boyd Palmer-Ball on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY (Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Courts instructions for briefing motions and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 4/11/2019. (lckbj1) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zef, ) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (zef, ) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6028395) filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet cover sheet, #2 Declaration corporate disclosure, #3 Summons Navy Summons, #4 Summons AG Summons, #5 Summons USAODC Summons)(Dinerstein, Paula) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/29/2019) (zef, ). (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.