This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/31/2020 at 21:29:11 (UTC).

PUBG Corporation et al v. NetEase, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/15/2019 PUBG Corporation filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NetEase, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey S. White. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-06615

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeffrey S. White

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PUBG Corporation

PUBG Santa Monica, Inc.

Defendants

NetEase Information Technology Corporation

NetEase, Inc.

Hong Kong NetEase Interactive Entertainment Limited

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David P. Enzminger

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

275 Middlefield Road, Suite 205

Menlo Park, CA 94025-4004

Diana L. Leiden

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

333 South Grand Avenue, 38Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Michael A. Tomasulo

Attorney at Winston & Strawn, LLP

333 South Grand Avenue, 38Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Defendant Attorneys

Michael Francis LaFond

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

555 Twin Dolphin Drive, 5Th Floor

Redwood City, CA 94043

Claude M. Stern

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

555 Twin Dolphin Drive, #560

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

 

Court Documents

#33

#32

#31

30 #1

[Proposed] Order Granting the NetEase Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismis

29 #4

REDACTED Joint Motion to Dismiss PUBG's Complaint

29 #3

*Restricted*

29 #2

[Proposed] Order Granting Motion to Seal

29 #1

Declaration of Michael LaFond in Support of Motion to Seal

#29

4 #6

*Restricted*

4 #5

*Restricted*

4 #4

Redacted Version of Exhibit B to Complaint

4 #2

Proposed Order

#3

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B (Redacted)

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Defendants NetEase, Inc., NetEase Information Technology Corporation, and Hong Kong NetEase Interactive Entertainment Limited (LaFond, Michael) (Filed on 1/27/2020) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/13/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/20/2020 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2020) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #29 Administrative Motion TO SEAL PORTIONS OF DEFENDANTS NETEASE, INC., NETEASE INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION, AND HONG KONG NETEASE INTERACTIVE ENTERTAINMENT, LTD.S JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2020) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Joint MOTION to Dismiss the PUBG Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Hong Kong NetEase Interactive Entertainment Limited, NetEase Information Technology Corporation, NetEase, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/28/2020 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Responses due by 2/4/2020. Replies due by 2/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order Granting the NetEase Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss)(Stern, Claude) (Filed on 1/21/2020) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of the NetEase Defendants' Joint Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss filed by Hong Kong NetEase Interactive Entertainment Limited, NetEase Information Technology Corporation, NetEase, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael LaFond in Support of Motion to Seal, #2 [Proposed] Order Granting Motion to Seal, #3 UNREDACTED Joint Motion to Dismiss PUBG's Complaint, #4 REDACTED Joint Motion to Dismiss PUBG's Complaint)(LaFond, Michael) (Filed on 1/21/2020) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Enzminger, David) (Filed on 1/21/2020) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • Docket(#27) ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. The parties have failed to file an ADR Certification as required by the Initial Case Management Scheduling Order. Counsel shall comply promptly with the requirements of ADR L.R. 3-5(b) and shall file the ADR Certification. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2020) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Tomasulo as Counsel for Plaintiffs (Tomasulo, Michael) (Filed on 1/7/2020) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting AS MODIFIED #23 Stipulation CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ENLARGING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT.Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/31/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/7/2020 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2020) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Docket(#24) ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. The parties have failed to file an ADR Certification as required by the Initial Case Management Scheduling Order. Counsel shall comply promptly with the requirements of ADR L.R. 3-5(b) and shall file the ADR Certification. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2020) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 10/30/2019
  • (#10) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2019) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by PUBG Corporation, PUBG Santa Monica, Inc... (Leiden, Diana) (Filed on 10/29/2019) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related / and Notice of Related Cases filed by PUBG Corporation, PUBG Santa Monica, Inc.. Responses due by 10/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Diana Hughes Leiden, #2 Exhibit A to Leiden Decl, #3 Exhibit B to Leiden Decl, #4 Proposed Order)(Enzminger, David) (Filed on 10/21/2019) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Issued as to Hong Kong NetEase Interactive Entertainment Limited, NetEase Information Technology Corporation, NetEase, Inc.. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2019) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/9/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/16/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2019) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • (#5) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/30/2019. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2019) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Complaint for Breach of Contract and Exhibit B thereto filed by PUBG Corporation, PUBG Santa Monica, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Diana Hughes Leiden, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Complaint, #4 Redacted Version of Exhibit B to Complaint, #5 Unredacted Version of Complaint, #6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit B to Complaint)(Enzminger, David) (Filed on 10/15/2019) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by PUBG Corporation, PUBG Santa Monica, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Krafton, Inc. for PUBG Corporation. (Enzminger, David) (Filed on 10/15/2019) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Proposed Summons. (Enzminger, David) (Filed on 10/15/2019) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT against NetEase, Inc., NetEase Information Technology Corporation, Hong Kong NetEase Interactive Entertainment Limited (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13795077). Filed by PUBG Corporation, PUBG Santa Monica, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B (Redacted), #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Enzminger, David) (Filed on 10/15/2019) Modified on 10/16/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NETEASE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where PUBG SANTA MONICA, INC. is a litigant