This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/02/2022 at 08:48:51 (UTC).

PTG Live Events LLC v. The Cincinnati Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 05/03/2022 PTG Live Events LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against The Cincinnati Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are William E Duffin and J P Stadtmueller. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00530

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

William E Duffin

J P Stadtmueller

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PTG Live Events LLC on Behalf of Themselves and All Others Similarly Situated doing business as Pabst Riverside Theater Group

Defendant

The Cincinnati Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jay A Urban

Attorney at Urban & Taylor SC

4701 N Port Washington Rd - Ste 400

Milwaukee, WI 53212-1040

Richard W Schulte

Attorney at Behnke Martin & Schulte LLC

812 E National Rd

Vandalia, OH 45377

Defendant Attorneys

Ericka C Hammett

Attorney at Litchfield Cavo LLP

250 E Wisconsin Ave - Ste 800

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Mark W Rattan

Attorney at Litchfield Cavo LLP

250 E Wisconsin Ave - Ste 800

Milwaukee, WI 53202

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 6/9/2022: ADOPTING #11 Parties' Stipulation of Dismissal; DENYING as moot #5 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss; and DISMISSING CASE with prejudice and without costs. (cc: all counsel)(jm)

#11

(#11) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Plaintiff and by The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Rattan, Mark)

#10

(#10) STIPULATION Joint Stipulation Regarding Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by PTG Live Events LLC. (Urban, Jay)

#9

(#9) PRETRIAL ORDER signed by Judge JP Stadtmueller on 5/18/2022. (cc: all counsel) (ld)

#8

RESTRICTED

7 #3

Ex. C - CDC Guidance

7 #2

Ex. B - Certified Policy

7 #1

Ex. A - CIC Case List

#7

(#7) BRIEF in Support filed by The Cincinnati Insurance Company re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) . (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - CIC Case List, #2 Ex. B - Certified Policy, #3 Ex. C - CDC Guidance)(Hammett, Ericka)

#6

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#5

(#5) MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) by The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Hammett, Ericka)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Ericka C Hammett on behalf of The Cincinnati Insurance Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Ericka C. Hammett (Hammett, Ericka)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Related Actions by The Cincinnati Insurance Company (Rattan, Mark)

#2

(#2) DISCLOSURE Statement by The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Rattan, Mark)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Declarations Pages of Cincinnati Policy

1 #1

Complaint and Circuit Court Record

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Cincinnati Insurance Company from Circuit Court of Milwaukee County, Case Number: 2022cv1619 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-4105068) (Attachments: #1 Complaint and Circuit Court Record, #2 Declaration of David T. Groff, #3 Declarations Pages of Cincinnati Policy, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rattan, Mark) Modified on 5/3/2022 (lz).

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 6/9/2022: ADOPTING #11 Parties' Stipulation of Dismissal; DENYING as moot #5 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss; and DISMISSING CASE with prejudice and without costs. (cc: all counsel)(jm)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Plaintiff and by The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Rattan, Mark)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION Joint Stipulation Regarding Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by PTG Live Events LLC. (Urban, Jay)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PRETRIAL ORDER signed by Judge JP Stadtmueller on 5/18/2022. (cc: all counsel) (ld)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketPursuant to the Local Rules and the related case, this case has been reassigned to Judge J P Stadtmueller. Judge Lynn Adelman no longer assigned to the case. (amb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketDISREGARD. DOCKETED IN ERROR. Case Reassigned to Judge Lynn Adelman. Magistrate Judge William E Duffin no longer assigned to the case. (lz) Modified on 5/13/2022 (amb).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Rattan, Mark)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) BRIEF in Support filed by The Cincinnati Insurance Company re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) . (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - CIC Case List, #2 Ex. B - Certified Policy, #3 Ex. C - CDC Guidance)(Hammett, Ericka)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DISREGARD - DOCUMENT REFILED - SEE ECF No #7 BRIEF in Support filed by The Cincinnati Insurance Company re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) . (Hammett, Ericka) Modified on 5/11/2022 (lz).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) by The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Hammett, Ericka)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Ericka C Hammett on behalf of The Cincinnati Insurance Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Ericka C. Hammett (Hammett, Ericka)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Related Actions by The Cincinnati Insurance Company (Rattan, Mark)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISCLOSURE Statement by The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Rattan, Mark)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketNOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Cincinnati Insurance Company from Circuit Court of Milwaukee County, Case Number: 2022cv1619 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-4105068) (Attachments: #1 Complaint and Circuit Court Record, #2 Declaration of David T. Groff, #3 Declarations Pages of Cincinnati Policy, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rattan, Mark) Modified on 5/3/2022 (lz).

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ericka C. Hammett