Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 10/27/2020 at 09:40:43 (UTC).

(PS) Novak v. Mendez et al

Case Summary

On 08/28/2020 PS Novak filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Mendez. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Allison Claire and John A. Mendez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01721

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Allison Claire

Presiding Judge

John A. Mendez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joseph William Novak

Rancho Cordova, CA 95670

Defendants

Amerihome Mortgage Company, LLC

Tina M. Mendez

Prober & Raphael, ALC

 

Court Documents

4 #1

Consent Form

#4

(#4) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED Initial Scheduling Conference SET for 2/24/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Kastilahn, A) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Amerihome Mortgage Company, LLC, Tina M. Mendez, Prober & Raphael, ALC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. *Joseph William Novak* *11030 Carmenet Way* *Rancho Cordova, CA 95670*. (Kastilahn, A) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Joseph William Novak. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kastilahn, A) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketRECEIPT number #CAE200108554 $400.00 fbo by Joseph Novak on 9/1/2020. (Kaminski, H) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Summons, #4 Civil New Case Documents for JAM served on Joseph William Novak. (Kastilahn, A) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED Initial Scheduling Conference SET for 2/24/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Kastilahn, A) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Amerihome Mortgage Company, LLC, Tina M. Mendez, Prober & Raphael, ALC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. *Joseph William Novak* *11030 Carmenet Way* *Rancho Cordova, CA 95670*. (Kastilahn, A) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Kastilahn, A) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Joseph William Novak. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kastilahn, A) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Prober and Raphael, ALC is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERIHOME MORTGAGE COMPANY LLC is a litigant