This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 05:27:18 (UTC).

PS) Miner v. Kings County Housing

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 a Civil Right - Other Civil Right case was filed by PS Miner against Kings County Housing in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01622

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Eastern District

Judge Details

Kimberly J. Mueller

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Madiha Miner

Defendant

Kings County Housing

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/12/19 GRANTING #5 Motion to Proceed IFP. Plaintiff's complaint #1 is DISMISSED; Plaintiff is GRANTED thirty days from the date of service of this order to file an amended complaint that complies with the requirements of the FRCP, and the Local Rules of Practice. Plaintiff's Motion for summary judgment #4 is DENIED without prejudice. (Mena-Sanchez, L) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

#2

(#2) MOTION for CEASE and DESIST ORDER by Madiha Miner. (Becknal, R) Modified on 9/12/2019 (Streeter, J). (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/21/2019 ORDERING plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE in writing, within 14 days of this order, why this action should not be dismissed with prejudice based on plaintiff's failure to comply with the court's order and failure to prosecute this case. Within 14 days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall file a first amended complaint. Failure to timely comply with the terms of this order will result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed. (Huang, H) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) MOTION for JUDGMENT by Madiha Miner. (Becknal, R) Modified on 9/12/2019 (Streeter, J). (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Kings County Housing by Madiha Miner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Becknal, R) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#5

(#5) MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Madiha Miner. (Becknal, R) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#4

(#4) MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Madiha Miner. (Becknal, R) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order to Show Cause and #6 Order served on Madiha Miner. (Huang, H) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/21/2019 ORDERING plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE in writing, within 14 days of this order, why this action should not be dismissed with prejudice based on plaintiff's failure to comply with the court's order and failure to prosecute this case. Within 14 days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall file a first amended complaint. Failure to timely comply with the terms of this order will result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed. (Huang, H) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order, served on Madiha Miner. (Mena-Sanchez, L) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/12/19 GRANTING #5 Motion to Proceed IFP. Plaintiff's complaint #1 is DISMISSED; Plaintiff is GRANTED thirty days from the date of service of this order to file an amended complaint that complies with the requirements of the FRCP, and the Local Rules of Practice. Plaintiff's Motion for summary judgment #4 is DENIED without prejudice. (Mena-Sanchez, L) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Becknal, R) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Madiha Miner. (Becknal, R) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Madiha Miner. (Becknal, R) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for JUDGMENT by Madiha Miner. (Becknal, R) Modified on 9/12/2019 (Streeter, J). (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for CEASE and DESIST ORDER by Madiha Miner. (Becknal, R) Modified on 9/12/2019 (Streeter, J). (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Kings County Housing by Madiha Miner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Becknal, R) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.