This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/23/2023 at 09:57:47 (UTC).

(PS) Ly v. Amazon.com Services LLC

Case Summary

On 02/22/2023 PS Ly filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Amazon com Services LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Dale A. Drozd and Jeremy D. Peterson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00323

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dale A. Drozd

Referral Judge

Jeremy D. Peterson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jack Ly

Defendant

Amazon.com Services LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Douglas L. Ropel

Lauren Orozco

Britney Noelle Torres

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento County Superior Court, case number 34-2022-00328670 by Amazon.com Services LLC. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10712334) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A - F, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Declaration Of Torres, #4 Declaration of Abrahams, #5 Declaration of Brown, #6 Notice of Interested Parties, #7 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #8 Proof of Service)(Ropel, Douglas) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

1 #1

Exhibit A - F

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Declaration Of Torres

1 #4

Declaration of Abrahams

1 #5

Declaration of Brown

1 #6

Notice of Interested Parties

1 #7

Statement Corporate Disclosure

1 #8

Proof of Service

#2

(#2) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Informational Order) (Kastilahn, A) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

2 #1

Informational Order

#3

(#3) ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 03/10/23 SETTING the Initial Scheduling Conference to 4/27/2023 at 10:00 AM via Zoom in Courtroom 9 (JDP) before Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson and DIRECTING the parties to file a status report, no later than 14 days prior to the scheduling conference. (Licea Chavez, V) (Entered: 03/13/2023)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Lauren Orozco on behalf of Amazon.com Services LLC. Attorney Orozco, Lauren added. (Orozco, Lauren) (Entered: 03/31/2023)

#5

(#5) STATUS REPORT by Amazon.com Services LLC. (Orozco, Lauren) (Entered: 04/13/2023)

#6

(#6) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 4/20/2023 CONTINUTING Initial Scheduling Conference set to 5/18/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (JDP) before Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson. Status Report due by 5/4/2023, and Plaintiff shall Show Cause, no later than 5/4/2023, why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to comply with the Court's #3 Order. (Reader, L) (Entered: 04/21/2023)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order to Show Cause, served on Jack Ly. (Reader, L) (Entered: 04/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 4/20/2023 CONTINUTING Initial Scheduling Conference set to 5/18/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (JDP) before Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson. Status Report due by 5/4/2023, and Plaintiff shall Show Cause, no later than 5/4/2023, why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to comply with the Court's #3 Order. (Reader, L) (Entered: 04/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STATUS REPORT by Amazon.com Services LLC. (Orozco, Lauren) (Entered: 04/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Lauren Orozco on behalf of Amazon.com Services LLC. Attorney Orozco, Lauren added. (Orozco, Lauren) (Entered: 03/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order served on Jack Ly. (Licea Chavez, V) (Entered: 03/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 03/10/23 SETTING the Initial Scheduling Conference to 4/27/2023 at 10:00 AM via Zoom in Courtroom 9 (JDP) before Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson and DIRECTING the parties to file a status report, no later than 14 days prior to the scheduling conference. (Licea Chavez, V) (Entered: 03/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Civil New Case Documents for DAD served on Jack Ly. (Kastilahn, A) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Informational Order) (Kastilahn, A) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento County Superior Court, case number 34-2022-00328670 by Amazon.com Services LLC. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10712334) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A - F, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Declaration Of Torres, #4 Declaration of Abrahams, #5 Declaration of Brown, #6 Notice of Interested Parties, #7 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #8 Proof of Service)(Ropel, Douglas) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less