This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 07:56:32 (UTC).

(PS) Graham v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 PS Graham filed a Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act lawsuit against United States Department of Homeland Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Troy L. Nunley and Edmund F. Brennan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02429

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Troy L. Nunley

Referral Judge

Edmund F. Brennan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mark E. Graham

Elk Grove, CA 95759

Defendants

United States Department of Homeland Security

United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement by Mark E. Graham. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Huang, H) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

4 #1

Consent Form

#4

(#4) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 5/20/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Huang, H) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#2

(#2) MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Mark E. Graham. (Huang, H) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement* with answer to complaint due within *30* days. Attorney *Mark E. Graham* *PO Box 1823* *Elk Grove, CA 95759*. (Huang, H) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketSERVICE BY MAIL: 5 Minute Order served on Mark E. Graham. (Cannarozzi, N) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MINUTE ORDER: Pltf's #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is DENIED as MOOT pursuant to his payment of the filing fees (see CAED Receipt #CAE200102754). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/9/2019. (Text only entry)(Cannarozzi, N) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE OVER COUNTER: #3 Summons, #4 Civil New Case Documents for TLN, served on Mark E. Graham. (Huang, H) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 5/20/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Huang, H) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement* with answer to complaint due within *30* days. Attorney *Mark E. Graham* *PO Box 1823* *Elk Grove, CA 95759*. (Huang, H) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketRECEIPT number #CAE200102754 $400.00 fbo Mark E. Graham by Mark E. Graham on 12/5/2019. (Huang, H) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketAPPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Huang, H) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Mark E. Graham. (Huang, H) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement by Mark E. Graham. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Huang, H) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.