This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/20/2022 at 05:45:23 (UTC).

(PS) Doe v. Nunemaker et al

Case Summary

On 05/19/2022 PS Doe filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Nunemaker. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Donna M. Ryu. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-02963

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Donna M. Ryu

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John Doe

Stryker, OH 43557-9418

Defendants

Joe Nunemaker

Dustin Greene

Darryl J. Holcombe

Will Davis

Jeanette Stanley

Sandra Diaz

Stephanie Augusta

Jason Michael Guyton

Amy Allen

City of Brentwood

Unknown Social Media Author

Nate Gartrell

Frank Pine

Bay Area News Group

The Mercury News

Opera Norway AS

East Bay Times

Particle Media, Inc.

Newstral

4 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by John Doe. (Benson, A.) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

#3

(#3) MOTION to PROCEED WITH PSEUDONYM by John Doe. (Benson, A.) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

#4

(#4) ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/17/2022 TRANSFERRING CASE to Northern District of California. (Coll, A) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

5 #5

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

5 #1

*Restricted*

#6

(#6) Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

#7

(#7) CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 6/27/2022. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 6/27/2022. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Case transferred in from District of California Eastern; Case Number 2:22-cv-00830. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order served on John Doe. (Coll, A) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/17/2022 TRANSFERRING CASE to Northern District of California. (Coll, A) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketAPPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Court Action Required. (Benson, A.) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to PROCEED WITH PSEUDONYM by John Doe. (Benson, A.) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by John Doe. (Benson, A.) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Benson, A.) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bay Area News Group is a litigant

Latest cases where PARTICLE MEDIA INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant