This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/24/2021 at 07:13:34 (UTC).

PS Business Management, LLC, et al v. Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, et al

Case Summary

On 06/24/2021 PS Business Management, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Fireman's Fund Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Janis van Meerveld and Martin L.C. Feldman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01229

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Janis van Meerveld

Presiding Judge

Martin L.C. Feldman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PS Business Management, LLC

CJA Nola Realty, LLC

Defendants

Fireman's Fund Insurance Company

Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company

Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty SE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John Clayton Butler

Attorney at Law Office of John Butler

3939 N. Causeway Blvd.Suite 201

Metairie, LA 70002

David M. McDonald

Attorney at Law Office of John Butler

3939 N. Causeway Blvd.Suite 300

Metairie, LA 70002

Jacqueline Claire Barber

Attorney at Law Office of Jacqueline Barber, LLC

734 9Th St.

New Orleans, LA 70115

Defendant Attorneys

Kelly Cambre Bogart

Attorney at Duplass, Zwain, Bourgeois, Pfister, Weinstock & Bogart

Three Lakeway Center3838 N. Causeway Blvd.

Metairie, LA 70002

Brett D. Solberg

Attorney at DLA Piper.LLP (US)

1000 Louisiana Streetsuite 2800

Houston, TX 77002-5005

Meredith N. Will

Attorney at Duplass Zwain Bourgeois Pfister Weinstock & Bogart

3838 North Causeway Blvd.Suite 2900

Metairie, LA 70002

Robert Myers Hoffman, I

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

1900 N. Pearl Streetsuite 2200

Dallas, TX 75201

Nicole M. Boyer

Attorney at Duplass, Zwain, Bourgeois, Pfister, Weinstock & Bogart

Three Lakeway Center3838 N. Causeway Blvd.

Metairie, LA 70002

 

Court Documents

13 #1

Pro Hac Notice

#13

12 #4

Proposed Order

12 #3

Exhibit C Ef-iling Registration

12 #2

Exhibit B Affidavit

12 #1

Exhibit A Certificate of Good Standing

#12

11 #5

Notice of Submission (Civil Only)

11 #4

Exhibit C Cajun Judgment

11 #3

Exhibit B Nite Judgment

11 #2

Exhibit A Policy

11 #1

Memorandum in Support

#11

#10

#9

#8

4 #1

Exhibit A Certificate of Good Standing

#4

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER GRANTING #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Robert Myers Hoffman. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 7/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Notice) (sa) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Robert M. Hoffman (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8964152) by Fireman's Fund Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B Affidavit, #3 Exhibit C Ef-iling Registration, #4 Proposed Order)(Boyer, Nicole) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Fireman's Fund Insurance Company. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A Policy, #3 Exhibit B Nite Judgment, #4 Exhibit C Cajun Judgment, #5 Notice of Submission)(Bogart, Kelly) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company by PS Business Management, LLC and CJA Nola Realty, LLC. (McDonald, David) Modified on 7/19/2021 (sa). (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) **DEFICIENT** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss Party Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company by PS Business Management, LLC. (McDonald, David) Modified on 7/15/2021 (cwa). (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Brett David Solberg. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 6/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Notice) (sa) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. IT IS ORDERED that Defendants, Fireman's Fund Insurance Company and Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, be granted an additional twenty-one (21) days, or until July 22, 2021, to file responsive pleadings. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 6/25/2021. (sa) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal. The Notice of Compliance should be filed separately from the Removal. The document was separated and docketed separately at Doc. #5 . (sa) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Compliance pursuant to 28:1447(b) by Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, Fireman's Fund Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal. (sa) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Brett D. Solberg (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8919063) by Fireman's Fund Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B Affidavit, #3 Exhibit C Ef-iling Registration, #4 Proposed Order)(Boyer, Nicole) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by Fireman's Fund Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Boyer, Nicole) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Martin L.C. Feldman and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (cc) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orleans Parish, case number 2021-1667 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8917210) filed by Fireman's Fund Insurance Company and Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Citations, #2 Exhibit B Certified Copy State Court Record, #3 Exhibit C Email, #4 Exhibit D NY Business Documents, #5 Exhibit E LA Business Documents, #6 Exhibit F Motion Dismiss, #7 Appendix Proof of Service, #8 Appendix Notice of Compliance, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Nicole M. Boyer added to party Fireman's Fund Insurance Company(pty:dft). (Boyer, Nicole) Modified text/filers on 6/25/2021 (sa). (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALLIANZ GLOBAL CORPORATE AND SPECIALTY is a litigant

Latest cases where ALLIANZ GLOBAL RISKS US INSURANCE CO is a litigant

Latest cases where Firemans Fund Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Meredith N Will