This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/09/2021 at 10:10:41 (UTC).

Pruitt v. Liberty Mutual Insurance

Case Summary

On 03/10/2021 Pruitt filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Liberty Mutual Insurance. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Gray M Borden and Madeline Hughes Haikala. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00369

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Gray M Borden

Madeline Hughes Haikala

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Terry Pruitt

Defendant

Liberty Mutual Insurance

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Samuel E Wiggins, III

Attorney at WIGGINS LAW FIRM LLC

334 Sixth Avenue South

Birmingham, AL 35205

Defendant Attorneys

Joshua B Baker

Attorney at MAYNARD COOPER & GALE PC

1901 6Th Avenue North, Suite 2400

Birmingham, AL 35203

Joshua R Hess

Attorney at MAYNARD COOPER & GALE PC

1901 Sixth Avenue North Suite 2400

Birmingham, AL 35203

Emily Burke

Attorney at Maynard Cooper & Gale

1901 6Th Ave N Suite 1700, 1901 6Th Ave N Suite 1700

Birmignham, AL 35203

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

#2

#3

#5

#7

7 #1

Exhibit Exhibit

#9

#10

10 #1

Exhibit A

#11

#12

#13

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER - Based on these representations, the Court remands this action to state court, but the Court retains jurisdiction for the limited purpose of hearing any dispute regarding the plaintiff's stipulation on the amount in controversy, including a Rule 11 motion for sanctions. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 4/13/2021. (KEK) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: The parties having not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the above styled civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Madeline Hughes Haikala Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden no longer assigned to the case. (KAM) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER TheClerk is DIRECTED to reassign this case to a district judge randomly drawn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 4/12/2021. (KAM) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Joint MOTION for Entry of Agreed Order Regarding Remand re #7 MOTION to Remand by Liberty Mutual Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Burke, Emily) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER that the parties are reminded that this case will be reassigned to a district judge after 5/1/2021 unless they unanimously consent to the the dispositive jurisdiction of a magistrate judge; Telephone Conference set for 4/21/2021 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden; parties to call as directed; if all parties submit an executed consent before 4/21/2021, the telephone conference will be cancelled. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 4/1/2021. (KAM) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) TEXT ORDER re #7 Motion to Remand filed by Plaintiff. Defendant shall file a response to the motion on or before April 6, 2021, and Plaintiff may file a reply on or before April 13, 2021. The briefing schedule for Defendant's #3 Motion to Dismiss is CONTINUED and will be reset, if necessary, after the court decides the Motion to Remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 03/23/2021. (STH) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Remand by Terry Pruitt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit)(Wiggins, Samuel) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) TEXT ORDER: For good cause, it is ORDERED that Defendant's unopposed #5 Motion to Stay Rule 26 Obligations and Discovery is GRANTED. The parties' obligations under Rule 26 are STAYED pending resolution of Defendant's #3 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 03/18/2021. (STH) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Unopposed MOTION to Stay Rule 26 Obligations and Discovery by Liberty Mutual Insurance. (Burke, Emily) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) TEXT ORDER re #3 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant. Plaintiff shall file a response to the motion on or before April 1, 2021, and Defendant may file a reply on or before April 8, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 03/18/2021. (STH) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Liberty Mutual Insurance. (Burke, Emily) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3795172. related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Liberty Mutual Insurance from Jefferson County Circuit Court, Bessemer, case number 68-2002900769., filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(KAM). (Hess, Joshua) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Liberty Mutual Insurance. filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance (Burke, Emily) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Liberty Mutual Insurance from Jefferson County Circuit Court, Bessemer, case number 68-2002900769., filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(KAM) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Liberty Mutual Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Emily C. Burke

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joshua B. Baker

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joshua R Hess