This case was last updated from PACER on 09/29/2020 at 08:27:24 (UTC).

Pruitt v. K&B Transportation, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/31/2020 Pruitt filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against K B Transportation, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Reona J. Daly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00750

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Reona J. Daly

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kaitlynn Pruitt

Kaitlyn P. Pruitt

Defendants

K&B Transportation, Inc.

Gerald W Boutwell

Gerald W. Boutwell

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amanda N. Murphy

Attorney at Goldblatt & Singer

8182 Maryland Avenue, Suite 801

St. Louis, MO 63105

Shaun Falvey

Attorney at Goldblatt & Singer

8182 Maryland Avenue, Suite 801

St. Louis, MO 63105

Defendant Attorneys

Michael Reda

Attorney at HeplerBroom LLC - Edwardsville

130 North Main Street, P.O. Box 510

Edwardsville, IL 62025

Adam S. McGonigle

Attorney at HeplerBroom LLC - Edwardsville

130 North Main Street, P.O. Box 510

Edwardsville, IL 62025

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Adam S. McGonigle on behalf of All Defendants (McGonigle, Adam) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Reda on behalf of All Defendants (Reda, Michael) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

#12

(#12) NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing K&B Transportation, Inc., and Gerald W. Boutwell to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to K&B Transportation, Inc., and Gerald W. Boutwell on 9/10/2020. Consent due by 10/1/2020 (kek) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

#10

(#10) MOTION to Dismiss and Strike by All Defendants. Responses due by 10/13/2020 (Reda, Michael) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kaitlyn P. Pruitt. K&B Transportation, Inc. served on 8/17/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. (Falvey, Shaun) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kaitlyn P. Pruitt. Gerald W. Boutwell served on 8/16/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. (Falvey, Shaun) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

#7

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Gerald W Boutwell and original mailed to Attorney Falvey. (kek) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to K&B Transportation, Inc. and original mailed to Attorney Falvey. (kek) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Kaitlyn P. Pruitt. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 20-cv-750-RJD. Consent due by 8/24/2020 (kek) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda N. Murphy on behalf of Kaitlynn Pruitt (Murphy, Amanda) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Shaun Falvey on behalf of Kaitlynn Pruitt (Falvey, Shaun) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

1 #3

Summons Gerald Boutwell

1 #2

Summons K & B Transportation

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Kaitlynn Pruitt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons K & B Transportation, #3 Summons Gerald Boutwell)(Falvey, Shaun) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Adam S. McGonigle on behalf of All Defendants (McGonigle, Adam) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Reda on behalf of All Defendants (Reda, Michael) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing K&B Transportation, Inc., and Gerald W. Boutwell to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to K&B Transportation, Inc., and Gerald W. Boutwell on 9/10/2020. Consent due by 10/1/2020 (kek) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF ACTION - See Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorney Michael Reda does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Dismiss and Strike by All Defendants. Responses due by 10/13/2020 (Reda, Michael) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kaitlyn P. Pruitt. K&B Transportation, Inc. served on 8/17/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. (Falvey, Shaun) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kaitlyn P. Pruitt. Gerald W. Boutwell served on 8/16/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. (Falvey, Shaun) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Falvey, Shaun) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Gerald W Boutwell and original mailed to Attorney Falvey. (kek) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to K&B Transportation, Inc. and original mailed to Attorney Falvey. (kek) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Kaitlyn P. Pruitt. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 20-cv-750-RJD. Consent due by 8/24/2020 (kek) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketFiling fee: $400.00, receipt number 0754-4243162 (kek) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda N. Murphy on behalf of Kaitlynn Pruitt (Murphy, Amanda) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Shaun Falvey on behalf of Kaitlynn Pruitt (Falvey, Shaun) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Kaitlynn Pruitt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons K & B Transportation, #3 Summons Gerald Boutwell)(Falvey, Shaun) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less