This case was last updated from PACER on 12/30/2019 at 07:59:00 (UTC).

Prowse v. Washington et al

Case Summary

On 10/31/2019 Prowse filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Washington. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Joe J. Volpe and James M. Moody Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00342

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Joe J. Volpe

Presiding Judge

James M. Moody Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ka'torah Arya Sage Prowse

Grady, AR 71644-0400

Defendants

Does 1-3, Correctional Officer, VSM, ADC

Brian Perkins

Walter Washington

Ned Buttler

John Does

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Jerry D. Garner

Attorney at Arkansas Attorney General's Office

Catlett-Prien Tower Building, 323 Center Street, Suite 200

Little Rock, AR 72201-2610

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) RESPONSE in Opposition to #10 Motion to Stay Discovery filed by Ka'Torah Arya Sage Prowse. (ljb) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#15

(#15) SUMMONS Returned Executed Ned Buttler served on 11/12/2019. (kdr) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

#14

(#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed Walter Washington served on 11/12/2019. (kdr) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

#12

(#12) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 5/27/2020. Dispositive motions due by 6/29/2020. Dispositive motions on the issue of exhaustion due by 1/27/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 11/27/2019. (lej) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

#11

(#11) NOTICE, CONSENT AND REFERENCE to a Magistrate Judge forwarded by the Clerk of Court. (lej) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

#10

(#10) MOTION to Stay Discovery and Incorporated Memorandum Brief in Support by Ned Buttler, Walter Washington (Garner, Jerry) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Ned Buttler, Walter Washington.(Garner, Jerry) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Jerry D. Garner on behalf of Ned Buttler, Walter Washington (Garner, Jerry) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER approving and adopting in its entirety #4 Proposed Findings and Recommended Disposition as this Court's findings in all respects; directing the Clerk to change docket entry #6 to reflect that it contains a motion for discovery, which will remain pending for Judge Volpe to address; dismissing without prejudice Plaintiff's official capacity claims and Plaintiff's claims against Brian Perkins; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from any Order adopting these recommendations would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 11/18/2019. (ljb) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Discovery by Ka'Torah Arya Sage Prowse. (kdr) (Docket entry modified on 11/18/2019 pursuant to #7 Order.)(cmn) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER that the Clerk prepare summons and the USM serve Defendants Washington and Butler without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 11/5/2019. (lej) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

#4

(#4) PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS that Plaintiff's official capacity claims be dismissed with prejudice. Plaintiff's claims against Brian Perkins be dismissed without prejudice. The Court certify, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from any order adopting these recommendations would not be taken in good faith. Objections due no later than 14 days from the date of the findings and recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 11/5/2019. (lej) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER granting Plaintiff's Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit #1 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 11/4/2019. (lej) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Ka'Torah Arya Sage Prowse.(kdr) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

#1

(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ka'Torah Arya Sage Prowse. (kdr) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER denying as moot Plaintiff's motion for discovery based on the order entered 11/27/2019 to stay discovery #6 13 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 12/9/2019. (lej) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) RESPONSE in Opposition to #10 Motion to Stay Discovery filed by Ka'Torah Arya Sage Prowse. (ljb) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) SUMMONS Returned Executed Ned Buttler served on 11/12/2019. (kdr) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed Walter Washington served on 11/12/2019. (kdr) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting Defendants' motion to stay discovery #10 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 11/27/2019. (lej) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 5/27/2020. Dispositive motions due by 6/29/2020. Dispositive motions on the issue of exhaustion due by 1/27/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 11/27/2019. (lej) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE, CONSENT AND REFERENCE to a Magistrate Judge forwarded by the Clerk of Court. (lej) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION to Stay Discovery and Incorporated Memorandum Brief in Support by Ned Buttler, Walter Washington (Garner, Jerry) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Ned Buttler, Walter Washington.(Garner, Jerry) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Jerry D. Garner on behalf of Ned Buttler, Walter Washington (Garner, Jerry) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER approving and adopting in its entirety #4 Proposed Findings and Recommended Disposition as this Court's findings in all respects; directing the Clerk to change docket entry #6 to reflect that it contains a motion for discovery, which will remain pending for Judge Volpe to address; dismissing without prejudice Plaintiff's official capacity claims and Plaintiff's claims against Brian Perkins; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from any Order adopting these recommendations would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 11/18/2019. (ljb) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Discovery by Ka'Torah Arya Sage Prowse. (kdr) (Docket entry modified on 11/18/2019 pursuant to #7 Order.)(cmn) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • Summons Issued as to Ned Buttler, Walter Washington and forwarded to the U.S. Marshal for service. (ljb) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER that the Clerk prepare summons and the USM serve Defendants Washington and Butler without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 11/5/2019. (lej) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS that Plaintiff's official capacity claims be dismissed with prejudice. Plaintiff's claims against Brian Perkins be dismissed without prejudice. The Court certify, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from any order adopting these recommendations would not be taken in good faith. Objections due no later than 14 days from the date of the findings and recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 11/5/2019. (lej) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER granting Plaintiff's Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit #1 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 11/4/2019. (lej) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Ka'Torah Arya Sage Prowse.(kdr) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ka'Torah Arya Sage Prowse. (kdr) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less