This case was last updated from PACER on 05/18/2021 at 09:46:37 (UTC).

PROVEN NETWORKS, LLC., v. SAP America, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/19/2021 PROVEN NETWORKS, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against SAP America, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00100

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROVEN NETWORKS, LLC.,

Defendants

SAP SE

SAP America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Reza Mirzaie

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat - Los Angeles

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Defendant Attorneys

Robert Edward Bugg

Attorney at Venable LLP - Washington

1270 6Th Ave

New York, NY 10020

Frank C Cimino, Jr

Attorney at Venable LLP

575 7Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Robert Christopher Bunt

Attorney at Parker Bunt & Ainsworth

100 E Ferguson, Suite 418

Tyler, TX 75702

Megan S Woodworth

Attorney at Venable LLP

575 7Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER granting #7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. answer due 7/14/2021; SAP SE answer due 7/14/2021. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/26/2021. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Edward Bugg on behalf of SAP America, Inc., SAP SE (Bugg, Robert) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Megan S Woodworth on behalf of SAP America, Inc., SAP SE (Woodworth, Megan) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Frank C Cimino, Jr on behalf of SAP America, Inc., SAP SE (Cimino, Frank) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

7 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#7

(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by SAP America, Inc., SAP SE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

5 #1

Envelope(s) SAP SE

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Issued as to SAP America, Inc., SAP SE Corporation Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Envelope(s) SAP SE)(nkl, ) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by PROVEN NETWORKS, LLC., (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE by PROVEN NETWORKS, LLC., re #1 Complaint, OF RELATED CASES (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against SAP America, Inc., SAP SE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8308548.), filed by PROVEN NETWORKS, LLC.,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. answer due 7/14/2021; SAP SE answer due 7/14/2021. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/26/2021. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Edward Bugg on behalf of SAP America, Inc., SAP SE (Bugg, Robert) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Megan S Woodworth on behalf of SAP America, Inc., SAP SE (Woodworth, Megan) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Frank C Cimino, Jr on behalf of SAP America, Inc., SAP SE (Cimino, Frank) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by SAP America, Inc., SAP SE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by PROVEN NETWORKS, LLC.,. SAP America, Inc. served on 3/31/2021, answer due 4/21/2021. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Issued as to SAP America, Inc., SAP SE Corporation Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Envelope(s) SAP SE)(nkl, ) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by PROVEN NETWORKS, LLC., (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by PROVEN NETWORKS, LLC., re #1 Complaint, OF RELATED CASES (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketCase ASSIGNED to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against SAP America, Inc., SAP SE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8308548.), filed by PROVEN NETWORKS, LLC.,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROVEN NETWORKS, LLC., is a litigant

Latest cases where SAP AMERICA, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Reza Mirzaie