This case was last updated from PACER on 05/02/2021 at 08:52:46 (UTC).

Proven Networks, LLC v. F5 Networks, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/03/2021 Proven Networks, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against F5 Networks, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00182

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Proven Networks, LLC

Defendant

F5 Networks, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Reza Mirzaie

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Brian D. Ledahl

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Marc A. Fenster

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Larry Craig Russ

Attorney at Russ August Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Benjamin T. Wang

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Jonathan Ma

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Kent N. Shum

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Paul A. Kroeger

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Defendant Attorneys

David Shane Brun

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP

601 S. California Avenue, Suite 100

Palo Alto, CA 94304

Angela C. Tarasi

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP

1400 16Th Street, 16 Market Square, Suite 400

Denver, CO 80202

Jonathan Weinberg

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP

601 S. California Avenue, Suite 100

Palo Alto, CA 94304

Jeffrey D. Mills

Attorney at King & Spalding

500 W. 2Nd Street, Suite 1800

Austin, TX 78701

Steven Mark Zager

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP

500 W. 2Nd St., Suite 1800

Austin, TX 78701

 

Court Documents

#48

(#48) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey D. Mills for Jonathan Weinberg, counsel for F5 Networks, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14573079) by on behalf of F5 Networks, Inc.. (Mills, Jeffrey) (Main Document 48 replaced on 3/10/2021) (am). (Entered: 03/09/2021)

#47

(#47) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey D. Mills for Angela C. Tarasi, counsel for F5 Networks, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14573061) by on behalf of F5 Networks, Inc.. (Mills, Jeffrey) (Main Document 47 replaced on 3/10/2021) (am). (Entered: 03/09/2021)

#46

(#46) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey D. Mills for David Shane Brun, counsel for F5 Networks, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14573053) by on behalf of F5 Networks, Inc.. (Mills, Jeffrey) (Main Document 46 replaced on 3/10/2021) (am). (Entered: 03/09/2021)

#45

(#45) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey D. Mills on behalf of F5 Networks, Inc.. Attorney Jeffrey D. Mills added to party F5 Networks, Inc.(pty:dft) (Mills, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

#44

(#44) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Mark Zager on behalf of F5 Networks, Inc.. Attorney Steven Mark Zager added to party F5 Networks, Inc.(pty:dft) (Zager, Steven) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

#43

(#43) Pro Hac Vice Letter to Larry Craig Russ. (lad) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

#42

(#42) Pro Hac Vice Letter to David Shane Brun/ Jonathan Weinberg. (lad) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

1 #10

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #9

Exhibit 9

1 #8

Exhibit 8

1 #7

Exhibit 7

1 #6

Exhibit 6

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#6) Certificate of Interested Entities by Proven Networks, LLC re #1 Complaint, (Mirzaie, Reza) (Filed on 8/11/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/3/2021.] (Entered: 08/11/2020)

59 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #48 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jonathan Weinberg for F5 Networks, Inc. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #47 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Angela Tarasi for F5 Networks, Inc. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #46 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David Shane Brun for F5 Networks, Inc. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey D. Mills for Jonathan Weinberg, counsel for F5 Networks, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14573079) by on behalf of F5 Networks, Inc.. (Mills, Jeffrey) (Main Document 48 replaced on 3/10/2021) (am). (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey D. Mills for Angela C. Tarasi, counsel for F5 Networks, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14573061) by on behalf of F5 Networks, Inc.. (Mills, Jeffrey) (Main Document 47 replaced on 3/10/2021) (am). (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey D. Mills for David Shane Brun, counsel for F5 Networks, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14573053) by on behalf of F5 Networks, Inc.. (Mills, Jeffrey) (Main Document 46 replaced on 3/10/2021) (am). (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey D. Mills on behalf of F5 Networks, Inc.. Attorney Jeffrey D. Mills added to party F5 Networks, Inc.(pty:dft) (Mills, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Mark Zager on behalf of F5 Networks, Inc.. Attorney Steven Mark Zager added to party F5 Networks, Inc.(pty:dft) (Zager, Steven) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) Pro Hac Vice Letter to Larry Craig Russ. (lad) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) Pro Hac Vice Letter to David Shane Brun/ Jonathan Weinberg. (lad) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Proven Networks, LLC. F5 Networks, Inc. served on 8/17/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Filed on 8/19/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/3/2021.] (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Issued as to F5 Networks, Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/3/2021.] (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/3/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/10/2020 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2020)[Transferred from California Northern on 3/3/2021.] (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • Docket(#7) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/26/2020. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/3/2021.] (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Certificate of Interested Entities by Proven Networks, LLC re #1 Complaint, (Mirzaie, Reza) (Filed on 8/11/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/3/2021.] (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Proven Networks, LLC re #1 Complaint, (Mirzaie, Reza) (Filed on 8/11/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/3/2021.] (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE by Proven Networks, LLC re #1 Complaint, Of Related Cases (Mirzaie, Reza) (Filed on 8/11/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/3/2021.] (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a Patent (cc: form mailed to register). (Mirzaie, Reza) (Filed on 8/11/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/3/2021.] (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Filed on 8/11/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/3/2021.] (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against F5 Networks, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14801646.). Filed byProven Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mirzaie, Reza) (Filed on 8/11/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/3/2021.] (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROVEN NETWORKS, LLC., is a litigant

Latest cases where F5 Networks, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Larry C Russ

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan Ma