This case was last updated from PACER on 05/23/2020 at 08:09:58 (UTC).

Proven Networks, LLC v. Extreme Networks, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/24/2020 Proven Networks, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Extreme Networks, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lucy H. Koh and Virginia K. DeMarchi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-02067

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lucy H. Koh

Referral Judge

Virginia K. DeMarchi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Proven Networks, LLC

Defendant

Extreme Networks, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Reza Mirzaie

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Brian David Ledahl

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Marc Aaron Fenster

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Benjamin T. Wang

Attorney at Russ, August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Jonathan Ma

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Paul Anthony Kroeger

Attorney at Russ, August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Kent N. Shum

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Defendant Attorneys

Richard Gregory Frenkel

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

140 Scott Drive

Menlo Park, CA 94025-1008

Thomas Yeh

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

355 South Grand Avenue, Suite 100

Los Angeles, CA 90071-1560

Lisa Kim Anh Nguyen

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

140 Scott Drive

Menlo Park, CA 94025-1008

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Relating Cases.(lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2020) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

#22

(#22) NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Anthony Kroeger (Kroeger, Paul) (Filed on 4/29/2020) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

#21

(#21) MOTION to Relate Case filed by Proven Networks, LLC. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Filed on 4/29/2020) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

#20

(#20) STIPULATION to Extend Time for Extreme Networks, Inc. to Respond to Proven Networks, LLC's Complaint for Patent Infringement filed by Extreme Networks, Inc.. (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 4/15/2020) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

#19

(#19) Certificate of Interested Entities by Extreme Networks, Inc. (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 4/15/2020) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

#18

(#18) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Extreme Networks, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate BlackRock Fund Advisors, a subsidiary of BlackRock, Inc. for Extreme Networks, Inc.. (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 4/15/2020) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Yeh (Yeh, Thomas) (Filed on 4/15/2020) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Kim Anh Nguyen (Nguyen, Lisa) (Filed on 4/15/2020) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Gregory Frenkel (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 4/15/2020) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Filed on 3/24/2020) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit Exhibit 6

1 #5

Exhibit Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement; Demand for Jury Trial against Extreme Networks, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-14311597.). Filed by Proven Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mirzaie, Reza) (Filed on 3/24/2020) Modified on 3/26/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/24/2020)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Relating Cases.(lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2020) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Anthony Kroeger (Kroeger, Paul) (Filed on 4/29/2020) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MOTION to Relate Case filed by Proven Networks, LLC. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Filed on 4/29/2020) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) STIPULATION to Extend Time for Extreme Networks, Inc. to Respond to Proven Networks, LLC's Complaint for Patent Infringement filed by Extreme Networks, Inc.. (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 4/15/2020) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Certificate of Interested Entities by Extreme Networks, Inc. (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 4/15/2020) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Extreme Networks, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate BlackRock Fund Advisors, a subsidiary of BlackRock, Inc. for Extreme Networks, Inc.. (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 4/15/2020) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Yeh (Yeh, Thomas) (Filed on 4/15/2020) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Kim Anh Nguyen (Nguyen, Lisa) (Filed on 4/15/2020) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Gregory Frenkel (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 4/15/2020) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • Docket(#14) **CLERK'S NOTICE FOLLOWING CASE REASSIGNMENT TO THE HONORABLE LUCY H. KOH** Following the case reassignment to the Honorable Lucy H. Koh, an Initial Case Management Conference is set for July 1, 2020 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th floor, in San Jose, California. The Joint Case Management Statement is due seven days prior to the Initial Case Management Conference. See Civil L.R. 16-9 and Civil L.R. 16-10(a). The parties shall familiarize themselves with the Scheduling Notes and Standing Orders for the Hon. Lucy H. Koh: http://cand.uscourts.gov/lhk. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2020) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Proven Networks, LLC.. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Filed on 4/2/2020) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF OTHER ACTIONS OR PROCEEDINGS by Proven Networks, LLC (Mirzaie, Reza) (Filed on 3/27/2020) Clerk made correction to correspond with document caption modified on 4/15/2020 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to Extreme Networks, Inc.. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2020) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/18/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/25/2020 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2020) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • Docket(#6) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/8/2020. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2020) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Certificate of Interested Entities by Proven Networks, LLC (Mirzaie, Reza) (Filed on 3/24/2020) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Proven Networks, LLC (Mirzaie, Reza) (Filed on 3/24/2020) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Patent Infringement. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Filed on 3/24/2020) Modified on 3/26/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Filed on 3/24/2020) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement; Demand for Jury Trial against Extreme Networks, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-14311597.). Filed by Proven Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mirzaie, Reza) (Filed on 3/24/2020) Modified on 3/26/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Extreme Networks, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where PROVEN NETWORKS, LLC., is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan Ma