This case was last updated from PACER on 07/04/2021 at 09:07:28 (UTC).

Proven Networks, LLC v. Barracuda Networks, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/05/2021 Proven Networks, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Barracuda Networks, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00467

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Proven Networks, LLC

Defendant

Barracuda Networks, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brian D. Ledahl

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Paul A. Kroeger

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Benjamin T. Wang

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Marc A. Fenster

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Jonathan Ma

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Reza Mirzaie

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Defendant Attorneys

Oren Joseph Torten

Attorney at Rimon, P.C.

2445 Faber Place, Suite 250

Palo Alto, CA 94303

Karineh Khachatourian

Attorney at Rimon, P.C.

2475 Hanover Street

Palo Alto, CA 94304

Nikolaus Andrew Woloszczuk

Attorney at Rimon, P.C.

2445 Faber Place, Suite 250

Palo Alto, CA 94303

Melissa Richards Smith

Attorney at Gillam and Smith, LLP

303 South Washington Avenue

Marshall, TX 75670

 

Court Documents

30 #1

Proposed Order

#30

(#30) Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Barracuda Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

29 #1

Proposed Order

#29

(#29) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , MOVE OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Barracuda Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

28 #1

Proposed Order

#28

(#28) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Melissa Richards Smith for K. Khachatourian ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14808997) by on behalf of Barracuda Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

#27

(#27) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of Barracuda Networks, Inc.. Attorney Melissa Richards Smith added to party Barracuda Networks, Inc.(pty:dft) (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

#26

(#26) Pro Hac Vice Letter to Nikolaus Andrew Woloszczuk and Oren Joseph Torten. (lad) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

#25

(#25) Pro Hac Vice Letter to Karineh Khachatourian. (lad) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

#4

#Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #4 Notice (Other) filed by Proven Networks, LLC (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/5/2021.] (Entered: 03/29/2021)

#3

(#3) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding PATENTS (cc: form mailed to register). (Mirzaie, Reza) (Filed on 3/29/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/5/2021.] (Entered: 03/29/2021)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Filed on 3/29/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/5/2021.] (Entered: 03/29/2021)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#6) Certificate of Interested Entities by Proven Networks, LLC re #1 Complaint, (Mirzaie, Reza) (Filed on 3/29/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/5/2021.] (Entered: 03/29/2021)

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Barracuda Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Barracuda Networks, Inc. answer due 6/21/2021. (mc5) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #29 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Before the Court is Defendant Barracuda Networks, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Extend the Deadline to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. The Court, having considered same, is of the opinion the motion should be GRANTED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (re) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , MOVE OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Barracuda Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #28 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ir) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Melissa Richards Smith for K. Khachatourian ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14808997) by on behalf of Barracuda Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of Barracuda Networks, Inc.. Attorney Melissa Richards Smith added to party Barracuda Networks, Inc.(pty:dft) (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Pro Hac Vice Letter to Nikolaus Andrew Woloszczuk and Oren Joseph Torten. (lad) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Pro Hac Vice Letter to Karineh Khachatourian. (lad) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Duplicate entry. [err103]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #5 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Proven Ne tworks, LLC (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/5/2021.] (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #4 Notice (Other) filed by Proven Networks, LLC (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/5/2021.] (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/22/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/29/2021 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/5/2021.] (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • Docket(#7) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/12/2021. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/5/2021.] (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Certificate of Interested Entities by Proven Networks, LLC re #1 Complaint, (Mirzaie, Reza) (Filed on 3/29/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/5/2021.] (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Proven Networks, LLC re #1 Complaint, (Mirzaie, Reza) (Filed on 3/29/2021) Modified on 3/29/2021 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/30/2021 (cv, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 5/5/2021.] (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) *** POSTED IN ERROR *** Corporate Disclosure Statement (Mirzaie, Reza) (Filed on 3/29/2021) Modified on 3/29/2021 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/30/2021 (cv, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 5/5/2021.] (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding PATENTS (cc: form mailed to register). (Mirzaie, Reza) (Filed on 3/29/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/5/2021.] (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Filed on 3/29/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/5/2021.] (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Barracuda Networks, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15765284.). Filed byProven Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mirzaie, Reza) (Filed on 3/29/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/5/2021.] (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Barracuda Networks, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where PROVEN NETWORKS, LLC., is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan Ma

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Benjamin T Wang