This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/07/2020 at 08:35:46 (UTC).

Proven Networks, LLC v. Arista Networks, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/08/2020 Proven Networks, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Arista Networks, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-00281

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Proven Networks, LLC

Defendant

Arista Networks, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Reza Mirzaie

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Kent N. Shum

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Paul A. Kroeger

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Marc A. Fenster

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Jonathan Ma

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Brian D. Ledahl

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

 

Court Documents

12 #1

Proposed Order

#12

(#12) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Proven Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kroeger, Paul) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Ma on behalf of Proven Networks, LLC. Attorney Jonathan Ma added to party Proven Networks, LLC(pty:pla) (Ma, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul A. Kroeger on behalf of Proven Networks, LLC. Attorney Paul A. Kroeger added to party Proven Networks, LLC(pty:pla) (Kroeger, Paul) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Proven Networks, LLC. Arista Networks, Inc. served on 4/16/2020, answer due 5/7/2020. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

#7

(#7) Pro Hac Vice Letter to Proven Networks, LLC for Benjamin T. Wang. (am) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Arista Networks, Inc.. (bw) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF RELATED CASES by Proven Networks, LLC re #1 Complaint, (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

#4

(#4) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Proven Networks, LLC. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

1 #8

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #7

Exhibit 7

1 #6

Exhibit 6

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT AGAINST ARISTA NETWORKS, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13441377), filed by Proven Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Arista Networks, Inc. answer due 6/22/2020. (am) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Plaintiff's Motion to extend the time for Defendant to Answer. The Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendant shall have up to and including June 22, 2020 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) (Entered: 05/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Proven Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kroeger, Paul) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Ma on behalf of Proven Networks, LLC. Attorney Jonathan Ma added to party Proven Networks, LLC(pty:pla) (Ma, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul A. Kroeger on behalf of Proven Networks, LLC. Attorney Paul A. Kroeger added to party Proven Networks, LLC(pty:pla) (Kroeger, Paul) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Proven Networks, LLC. Arista Networks, Inc. served on 4/16/2020, answer due 5/7/2020. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Pro Hac Vice Letter to Proven Networks, LLC for Benjamin T. Wang. (am) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Arista Networks, Inc.. (bw) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bw) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF RELATED CASES by Proven Networks, LLC re #1 Complaint, (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Proven Networks, LLC. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Proven Networks, LLC. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT AGAINST ARISTA NETWORKS, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13441377), filed by Proven Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Arista Networks, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where PROVEN NETWORKS, LLC., is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan Ma

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kent N. Shum